This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2023 at 07:55:10 (UTC).

Long v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/03/2023 Long filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian J. Davis and Patricia D. Barksdale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00382

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian J. Davis

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chantel Long

Defendant

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory D. Swartwood

Defendant Attorneys

Jeannine Cline Jacobson

Latanae L. Parker

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - venue

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (JDR) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Chantel Long. Related case(s): No (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Chantel Long. (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#9

(#9) RETURN of service executed on 4/21/2023 by Chantel Long as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#12

(#12) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The defendant must respond to the complaint by May 26, 2023. For future motions, counsel must comply with Local Rule 3.01(g)(2), which requires use of the heading "Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification." Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 5/8/2023. (DS) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of service executed on 4/21/2023 by Chantel Long as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • Docket(#8) ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to remove from the docket 6 the notice of a related action as a duplicate filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/20/2023. (ASL) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Chantel Long. (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Chantel Long. Related case(s): No (Swartwood, Gregory) (Modified on 4/18/2023 Duplicate of #5) (JDR). (Modified on 4/21/2023 PDF Removed per 8 Order) (JDR). (Entered: 04/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Chantel Long. Related case(s): No (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (JDR) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:23-cv-382-BJD-PDB. (BCB) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20684459) filed by Chantel Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - venue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less