This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2023 at 06:16:42 (UTC).

NextGen Innovations, LLC v. AT&T Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 NextGen Innovations, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00263

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

NextGen Innovations, LLC

Counter Claimants and Defendants

AT&T Services, Inc.

AT&T Mobility, LLC

AT&T Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Andrew D Weiss

Paul Anthony Kroeger

Benjamin T Wang

Andrea Leigh Fair

Qi Tong

Claire Abernathy Henry

Irene Y Lee

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Brett Christopher Govett

Daniel S Leventhal

David Michael Dyer

Vlada A. Wendel

Talbot Richard Hansum

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Dyer on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Dyer, David) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of NextGen Innovations, LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of NextGen Innovations, LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

#17

(#17) ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/17/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vlada A. Wendel on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Wendel, Vlada) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel S Leventhal on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Leventhal, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Talbot Richard Hansum on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Hansum, Talbot) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Christopher Govett on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against NextGen Innovations, LLC by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc..(Govett, Brett) (Entered: 06/25/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of NextGen Innovations, LLC (Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Irene Y Lee on behalf of NextGen Innovations, LLC (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by NextGen Innovations, LLC of Related Cases (Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#2

(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by NextGen Innovations, LLC (Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against NextGen Innovations, LLC by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc..(Govett, Brett) (Entered: 06/25/2023)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Dyer on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Dyer, David) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of NextGen Innovations, LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of NextGen Innovations, LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/17/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vlada A. Wendel on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Wendel, Vlada) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel S Leventhal on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Leventhal, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Talbot Richard Hansum on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Hansum, Talbot) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Christopher Govett on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against NextGen Innovations, LLC by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc..(Govett, Brett) (Entered: 06/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Qi Tong on behalf of NextGen Innovations, LLC (Tong, Qi) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of NextGen Innovations, LLC (Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of NextGen Innovations, LLC (Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Irene Y Lee on behalf of NextGen Innovations, LLC (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by NextGen Innovations, LLC of Related Cases (Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by NextGen Innovations, LLC (Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9528676.), filed by NextGen Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wang, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less