5:23-CV-00263
09/19/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Labor - Employee Benefit
Matthew A. Stinnett
Claria Horn Boom
Cheryl Gillenwater
Prudential Insurance Company of America
Bartley K. Hagerman
Philip G. Fairbanks
Alnisa Bell
Buddy J. VanCleave
Nathan P. Lusignan
(#11) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lusignan, Nathan) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
Magistrate Consent Form
(#10) ORDER: 1) Parties meet w/in 21 days. 2) Joint Status Report w/in 10 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 10/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (DC) cc: COR (Entered: 10/13/2023)
Proposed Order
Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex C - ECF Training N.
Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex B - COGS September 7
Exhibit Gillenwater_ Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex A - Affidavit (Lusig
(#8) MOTION for Nathan P. Lusignan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659568)Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gillenwater_ Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex A - Affidavit (Lusignan)(98646470.1), #2 Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex B - COGS September 7, 2023 (N. Lusignan)(98643536.1), #3 Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex C - ECF Training N. Lusignan, #4 Proposed Order)(VanCleave, Buddy) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER
Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex C - ECF Training A.
Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex B - COGS July 28, 20
Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - Ex A - Affidavit (Bell)
(#7) MOTION for Alnisa Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659530)Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - Ex A - Affidavit (Bell), #2 Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex B - COGS July 28, 2023 (A. Bell)(98643694.1), #3 Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex C - ECF Training A. Bell, #4 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(VanCleave, Buddy) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
(#6) ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT PRUDENTIALS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(VanCleave, Buddy) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
(#5) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (KMP) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
(#3) STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/4/2021. (KMP) cc: COR (Entered: 09/19/2023)
Civil Cover Sheet
(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-2758. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5653702), filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record, #3 Notice of N.O.R.)(KMP) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (KM) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lusignan, Nathan) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) ORDER: 1) Parties meet w/in 21 days. 2) Joint Status Report w/in 10 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 10/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (DC) cc: COR (Entered: 10/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Nathan P. Lusignan and Alnisa Bell: re 9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Nathan P. Lusignan and Alnisa Bell (KMP) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alnisa Bell; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alnisa Bell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 9/28/2023. (KMP) cc: COR (Entered: 09/28/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: re #8 MOTION for Nathan P. Lusignan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659568), #7 MOTION for Alnisa Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659530), ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: #6 Answer to Complaint (KM) (Entered: 09/27/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketBAR STATUS Check completed as to Nathan P. Lusignan re #8 MOTION for Nathan P. Lusignan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659568). (KM) (Entered: 09/27/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketBAR STATUS Check completed as to Alnisa Bell re #7 MOTION for Alnisa Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659530). (KM) (Entered: 09/27/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) MOTION for Nathan P. Lusignan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659568)Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gillenwater_ Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex A - Affidavit (Lusignan)(98646470.1), #2 Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex B - COGS September 7, 2023 (N. Lusignan)(98643536.1), #3 Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex C - ECF Training N. Lusignan, #4 Proposed Order)(VanCleave, Buddy) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) MOTION for Alnisa Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659530)Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - Ex A - Affidavit (Bell), #2 Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex B - COGS July 28, 2023 (A. Bell)(98643694.1), #3 Exhibit Gillenwater, Cheryl v. Prudential - PHV Motion - Ex C - ECF Training A. Bell, #4 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(VanCleave, Buddy) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT PRUDENTIALS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(VanCleave, Buddy) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (KMP) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/4/2021. (KMP) cc: COR (Entered: 09/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketConflict Check run. (KMP) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-2758. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5653702), filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record, #3 Notice of N.O.R.)(KMP) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
[-] Read Less