This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2023 at 08:07:17 (UTC).

HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/06/2023 HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02915

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HDI Global Insurance Company

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant

SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

Chidori Ship Holding LLC

Jessica Ship Holding S.A.

NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD.

Ocean Network Express PTE LTD.

M/V One Apus in rem

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Peter Skoufalos

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD. waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

#41

(#41) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jessica Ship Holding S.A. waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

#40

(#40) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Chidori Ship Holding LLC waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

#39

(#39) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ocean Network Express PTE LTD. waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

#38

(#38) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jessica Ship Holding S.A...(pc) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

#37

(#37) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chidori Ship Holding LLC..(pc) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

#36

(#36) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ocean Network Express PTE LTD...(pc) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

#35

(#35) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD...(pc) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

26 #2

Exhibit 2-Answer

26 #1

Exhibit 1-Complaint

#8

(#8) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3). Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 29 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of New York for the reasons set forth in the order of June 1, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Paul A. Englelmayer. (mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH TO THE HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/31/23. 1/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kelli Despot re: served Summons in a Civil Action Civil Cover Sheet, Case Management Track Designation Form, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statements, Complaint in Admiralty, and Exhibits upon Nicole Grimme by Personal Service on 01/04/2023 (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jayson Young re: served Summons in a Civil Action Civil Cover Sheet, Case Management Track Designation Form, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statements, Complaint in Admiralty, and Exhibits upon Gwen P. by Personal Service on 01/09/2023 (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILING OF NOTICE OF TAG-ALONG ACTION WITH JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTISTATE LITIGATION. (ERROR WITH FILING; INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON PDF). (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) Modified on 12/29/2022 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Attorney Required Forms, Designation Form (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC. Forwarded To: counsel on 12/22/22. (mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#1

(#3) NOTICE by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Attorney Required Forms, Designation Form (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 12/28/2022)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#42) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD. waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#41) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jessica Ship Holding S.A. waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#40) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Chidori Ship Holding LLC waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#39) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ocean Network Express PTE LTD. waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jessica Ship Holding S.A...(pc) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chidori Ship Holding LLC..(pc) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ocean Network Express PTE LTD...(pc) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD...(pc) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter Skoufalos. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., re: #26 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3). Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 29 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of New York for the reasons set forth in the order of June 1, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Paul A. Englelmayer. (mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 03/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketCOPY OF DOC. NO. 7 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREP. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH TO THE HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/31/23. 1/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kelli Despot re: served Summons in a Civil Action Civil Cover Sheet, Case Management Track Designation Form, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statements, Complaint in Admiralty, and Exhibits upon Nicole Grimme by Personal Service on 01/04/2023 (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 01/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jayson Young re: served Summons in a Civil Action Civil Cover Sheet, Case Management Track Designation Form, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statements, Complaint in Admiralty, and Exhibits upon Gwen P. by Personal Service on 01/09/2023 (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 01/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILING OF NOTICE OF TAG-ALONG ACTION WITH JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTISTATE LITIGATION. (ERROR WITH FILING; INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON PDF). (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) Modified on 12/29/2022 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Attorney Required Forms, Designation Form (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC. Forwarded To: counsel on 12/22/22. (mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 12/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022

DocketAttorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file Designation Form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. (sbt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 12/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HDI Global Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16389555.), filed by HDI Global Insurance Company.(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.] (Entered: 12/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less