This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2023 at 08:17:00 (UTC).

A&A Coating, Inc. v. American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania

Case Summary

On 07/20/2023 A A Coating, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A&A Coating, Inc.

Defendant

American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald A Waltz

Defendant Attorney

Anthony Scott Cox

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania's ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania.(Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/29/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

19 #1

Proposed Order

12 #5

Exhibit

12 #4

Exhibit

12 #3

Exhibit

12 #2

Exhibit

12 #1

Exhibit

#12

(#21) American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania's ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania.(Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

#3

(#3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement identifying party citizenship filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania (Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

#2

(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,,.. (Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

1 #6

Exhibit A-5 - American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania's Answer a

1 #5

Exhibit A-4 - Executed Return of Service on American Casualty Company of Reading

1 #4

Exhibit A-3 - June 22, 2023 Correspondence from Plaintiff's counsel

1 #3

Exhibit A-2 - Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

1 #2

Exhibit A-1 - State District Court Certified Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Index of State Court Documents

#1

(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,,.. (Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania's ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania.(Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/29/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Deficiency, of #17 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Cox, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint submitted document #17 does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to answer the Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 12) is extended to September 1, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/25/23. (bga) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) DEFICIENT DOCUMENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Anthony) Modified on 8/28/2023 (nkl, ). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/23/2023. (klc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER- Jury Selection set for 1/6/2025 at 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/23/2023. (klc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 8/23/2023. Proposed deadlines for Docket Control Order and Discovery Order discussed. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Donald Waltz; Defense - Anthony Cox. (No exhibits)(Court Reporter Not Recorded.) (bga) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2023 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/24/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by A&A Coating, Inc. (Waltz, Donald) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania (Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORIGINAL ANSWER to #4 Complaint by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania filed in IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF MORRIS COUNTY, TEXAS 76th/276th JUDICIAL DISTRICT.(nkl, ) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORIGINAL PETITION against American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, filed by A&A Coating, Inc. filed in the District Court of Morris County, Texas.(nkl, ) Modified on 7/20/2023 (nkl, ). (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement identifying party citizenship filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania (Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,,.. (Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9609298), filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit A-1 - State District Court Certified Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit A-3 - June 22, 2023 Correspondence from Plaintiff's counsel, #5 Exhibit A-4 - Executed Return of Service on American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, #6 Exhibit A-5 - American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania's Answer and Jury Demand)(Cox, Anthony) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less