This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2023 at 07:05:49 (UTC).

Kimberly Lua v. Bellflower Unified School District

Case Summary

On 04/27/2023 Kimberly Lua filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Bellflower Unified School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Pedro V. Castillo and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-03202

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Lua

Defendant

Bellflower Unified School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tania L Whiteleather

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin Marie Myers

Marlon C Wadlington

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/10/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bellflower Unified School District answer now due 7/17/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Bellflower Unified School District.(Attorney Marlon C Wadlington added to party Bellflower Unified School District(pty:dft))(Wadlington, Marlon) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

11 #1

Exhibit Proof of Service

#11

(#11) Notice of Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Lua. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Whiteleather, Tania) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 23-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-00043 FMO(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-03202 FMO(PVCx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Bellflower Unified School District. (jtil) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Lua. (Whiteleather, Tania) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Whiteleather, Tania) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 1 part 4

1 #3

Exhibit 1 part 3

1 #2

Exhibit 1 part 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1 part 1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/10/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bellflower Unified School District answer now due 7/17/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Bellflower Unified School District.(Attorney Marlon C Wadlington added to party Bellflower Unified School District(pty:dft))(Wadlington, Marlon) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Lua. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Whiteleather, Tania) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 23-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-00043 FMO(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-03202 FMO(PVCx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Bellflower Unified School District. (jtil) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Lua. (Whiteleather, Tania) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Whiteleather, Tania) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35216132 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Lua. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 part 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Tania L Whiteleather added to party Kimberly Lua(pty:pla))(Whiteleather, Tania) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less