This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2023 at 07:52:10 (UTC).

Greer v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Greer filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas T. Cullen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:23-CV-00311

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas T. Cullen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Staci Naomi Greer

Defendant

Nissan North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Ben Feinman

Defendant Attorney

Paul C. Kuhnel

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Criminal Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons for Nissan North America, Inc. by Staci Naomi Greer (Feinman, James) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/16/2023) (slt). Modified on 6/16/2023-replaced PDF with flatten document. (slt).

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(slt) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/16/2023) (slt). Modified on 6/16/2023-replaced document with correct pdf (slt).

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Nissan North America, Inc..(Kuhnel, Paul)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (slt)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Nissan North America, Inc..(Kuhnel, Paul)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(slt) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/16/2023) (slt). Modified on 6/16/2023-replaced document with correct pdf (slt).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons for Nissan North America, Inc. by Staci Naomi Greer (Feinman, James) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/16/2023) (slt). Modified on 6/16/2023-replaced PDF with flatten document. (slt).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4193823.), filed by Staci Naomi Greer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln) Modified title of attachment on 5/25/2023 (sln). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/26/2023Replaced deficient/incorrect pdf document with corrected pdf document) 5/26/2023 (sln). Modified document description in Utilities on 5/30/2023 (sln).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less