This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2023 at 09:09:50 (UTC).

Minchew v. Ryder Truck Rental Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2023 Minchew filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ryder Truck Rental Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-01935

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Letitia Minchew

Defendants

Ryder Truck Rental Inc

Ryder Transportation Solutions LLC

Darrell T Hoover

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jackson Whittaker Morrison

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Stefan Allen

Richard J Byrne

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13995613) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Byrne, Richard) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Darrell T. Hoover, Ryder Transportation Solutions, LLC, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Byrne, Richard) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

#5

(#5) Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Byrne, Richard) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Defs' Consent to Removal filed by Ryder Truck Rental Inc (Byrne, Richard) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jackson Whittaker Morrison on behalf of Letitia Minchew. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Morrison, Jackson) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#8

(#8) Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Morrison, Jackson) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#9

(#9) First MOTION to Remand to State Court Dallas County, 14th Judicial District Court filed by Letitia Minchew with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Morrison, Jackson) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

9 #1

Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ryder Transportation Solutions LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Byrne, Richard) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ryder Transportation Solutions LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Byrne, Richard) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) First MOTION to Remand to State Court Dallas County, 14th Judicial District Court filed by Letitia Minchew with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Morrison, Jackson) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Morrison, Jackson) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jackson Whittaker Morrison on behalf of Letitia Minchew. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Morrison, Jackson) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Defs' Consent to Removal filed by Ryder Truck Rental Inc (Byrne, Richard) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Byrne, Richard) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. NEF of Electronic Order Thu Aug 31 16:03:30 CDT 2023 (crt) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

Docket(#4) Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at: # Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/30/2023) (cfk) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Darrell T. Hoover, Ryder Transportation Solutions, LLC, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Byrne, Richard) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13995613) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Byrne, Richard) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less