This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2023 at 09:55:14 (UTC).

ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC et al v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lindsay C. Jenkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03230

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lindsay C. Jenkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC

Seed Beauty, LLC

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint

beike store

Soko Camelia Store

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Blake C Goebel

Rossana Baeza

Defendant Attorneys

David Randolph Bennett

Steven G Kalberg

 

Court Documents

#55

(#55) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint on 7/19/2023, answer due 8/9/2023; beike store on 7/19/2023, answer due 8/9/2023. (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#54

(#54) STATUS Report Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#53

(#53) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#50

(#50) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The unopposed motion to reset the July 27, 2023 status hearing #49 is granted. Due to the Court's calendar, the status hearing set for July 27, 2023 #44 is reset to August 22, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2119. The parties should file a joint status report by or before August 16, 2023 instead of on July 25, 2023. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#49

(#49) MOTION by Defendant beike store to reset July 27, 2023 Status Conference to a Telephone Hearing or, in the Alternative Move the Hearing Date (Unopposed) (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#52

(#52) ANSWER to Complaint by Soko Camelia Store. (aee, ) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

#51

(#51) ANSWER to Complaint by Soko Camelia Store. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#48

(#48) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC by Rossana Baeza (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#44

(#50) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The unopposed motion to reset the July 27, 2023 status hearing #49 is granted. Due to the Court's calendar, the status hearing set for July 27, 2023 #44 is reset to August 22, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2119. The parties should file a joint status report by or before August 16, 2023 instead of on July 25, 2023. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM in support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#7

(#7) CLAIM by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC regarding Trademarks. (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC by Anna Iskikian (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

2 #1

Exhibit Ex. 2 Provisionally filed under Seal Schedule A slipsheet

#2

(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC Ex. 1 Trademark Registrations regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2 Provisionally filed under Seal Schedule A slipsheet)(Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#1

(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC Ex. 1 Trademark Registrations regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2 Provisionally filed under Seal Schedule A slipsheet)(Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint on 7/19/2023, answer due 8/9/2023; beike store on 7/19/2023, answer due 8/9/2023. (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) STATUS Report Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The unopposed motion to reset the July 27, 2023 status hearing #49 is granted. Due to the Court's calendar, the status hearing set for July 27, 2023 #44 is reset to August 22, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2119. The parties should file a joint status report by or before August 16, 2023 instead of on July 25, 2023. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION by Defendant beike store to reset July 27, 2023 Status Conference to a Telephone Hearing or, in the Alternative Move the Hearing Date (Unopposed) (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ANSWER to Complaint by Soko Camelia Store. (aee, ) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ANSWER to Complaint by Soko Camelia Store. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC by Rossana Baeza (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: Defendant beike store's unopposed motion for extension of time in which to answer or otherwise plead #46 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on or before August 16, 2023. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION by Defendant beike store for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint (unopposed) (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of Anna Iskikian in support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Jan 2011 Mark Monitor, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 2020 IP Rights Seizures Stat Report, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - BASCAP Report, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - ICANN Registrar Accreditation Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Hague Convention on Service Abroad, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Translation of Civil Procedure Law of the People of China)(Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC for leave to file excess pages regarding Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order. (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM in support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLAIM by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC regarding Trademarks. (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC Schedule A to Complaint (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC by Anna Iskikian (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC Ex. 1 Trademark Registrations regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2 Provisionally filed under Seal Schedule A slipsheet)(Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by ColourPop Cosmetics, LLC, Seed Beauty, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20664131.(Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less