This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 07:03:05 (UTC).

Almulaiki et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Almulaiki filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina R. Morrison and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03781

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina R. Morrison

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki

Superior Crescent Deli Inc.

Defendants

United States of America

United States Department of Agriculture

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jess M. Berkowitz

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16719733 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 10/14/2021, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit Attorney letter 10/19/2021, #5 Exhibit FNS letter 6/22/2022, #6 Exhibit Attorney letter 6/24/2022, #7 Exhibit Final Agency Decision) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

1 #1

Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff

1 #2

Exhibit FNS letter 10/14/2021

1 #3

Exhibit Transaction Reports

1 #4

Exhibit Attorney letter 10/19/2021

1 #5

Exhibit FNS letter 6/22/2022

1 #6

Exhibit Attorney letter 6/24/2022

1 #7

Exhibit Final Agency Decision

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc.. United States Department of Agriculture served on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023; United States of America served on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc.. United States Department of Agriculture served on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023; United States of America served on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: An In-Person Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/20/2023 at 11:20 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 9/5/2023. In the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiffs must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/24/2023. (MG) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Nina R. Morrison and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16719733 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 10/14/2021, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit Attorney letter 10/19/2021, #5 Exhibit FNS letter 6/22/2022, #6 Exhibit Attorney letter 6/24/2022, #7 Exhibit Final Agency Decision) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less