1:23-CV-03781
05/19/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Other - Administrative Procedure Act
Nina R. Morrison
Vera M. Scanlon
Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki
Superior Crescent Deli Inc.
United States of America
United States Department of Agriculture
Jess M. Berkowitz
(#1) COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16719733 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 10/14/2021, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit Attorney letter 10/19/2021, #5 Exhibit FNS letter 6/22/2022, #6 Exhibit Attorney letter 6/24/2022, #7 Exhibit Final Agency Decision) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff
Exhibit FNS letter 10/14/2021
Exhibit Transaction Reports
Exhibit Attorney letter 10/19/2021
Exhibit FNS letter 6/22/2022
Exhibit Attorney letter 6/24/2022
Exhibit Final Agency Decision
(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc.. United States Department of Agriculture served on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023; United States of America served on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc.. United States Department of Agriculture served on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023; United States of America served on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketSCHEDULING ORDER: An In-Person Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/20/2023 at 11:20 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 9/5/2023. In the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiffs must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/24/2023. (MG) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Assigned to Judge Nina R. Morrison and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16719733 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Mohamed Nagi Almulaiki, Superior Crescent Deli Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 10/14/2021, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit Attorney letter 10/19/2021, #5 Exhibit FNS letter 6/22/2022, #6 Exhibit Attorney letter 6/24/2022, #7 Exhibit Final Agency Decision) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read Less