This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/23/2023 at 08:33:46 (UTC).

GEDEON v. UNITED STATES et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2023 GEDEON filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against UNITED STATES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01600

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASCAL GEDEON

Defendants

UNITED STATES

U.S. DISTRICT ATTORNEY

VERIZON, INC.

WORDPRESS INC.

AUTO MATTIC INC.

TWO UNKNOWN FEDERAL OFFICERS

TUMBLR INC.

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF IS DENIED. THE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE TIME TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FRCP 4(m) IS EXTENDED TO THE DATE 90 DAYS AFTER THE COURT ISSUES SUMMONSES IN THIS CASE IF SUMMONSES ARE ISSUED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/21/23. 6/22/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#17

(#17) MOTION FOR REIEF FROM THE ORDER ISSUED ON 5/18/23 FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

#16

(#16) MOTION TO EXTEND TIME AND FOR RECONSIDERATION/RELIEF FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

#15

(#15) ORDER THAT MOTIONS (8,9,10,11,12) ARE DENIED. THIS CASE REMAINS STAYED PENDING THE FINAL OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CHARGES IN U.S. v. GIDEON, NO. 21-CR-210 (E.D.PA). THE TIME TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FRCP 4(m) IS EXTENDED TO THE DATE 90 DAYS AFTER THE COURT ISSUES SUMMONSES IN THIS CASE IF SUMMONSES ARE ISSUED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/13/23. 6/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/13/23. 6/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (mbh) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#13

(#13) Supplemental Pleading filed by PASCAL GEDEON. (mbh) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#12

(#12) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE ORDER ISSUED ON 5/18/23 FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#11

(#11) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON. (mbh) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. GEDEON SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF FDC PHILA. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. MR. GEDEON'S CLAIMS AGAINST ROMERO, HARRELL AND GEIGER ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TERMINATE ROMERO, HARRELL AND GEIGER AS DEFENDANTS. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CORRECT THE SPELLING OF DEFENDANT TUMBLR INC. ON THE DOCKET. MR. GEDEON'S MOTION FOR STANDBY COUNSEL IS DENIED AS PREMATURE. THE TIME TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FRCP IS EXTENDED TO THE DATE 90 DAYS AFTER THE COURT ISSUES SUMMONSES IN THIS CASE IF SUMMONSES RE ISSUED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/18/23. 5/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE (mbh). (Entered: 05/18/2023)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/18/23. 5/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (mbh) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

#5

(#5) PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES. (mbh) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) MOTION TO GUIDE ASSISTANCE OF STANDBY COUNSEL FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) Modified on 4/28/2023 (lvj). (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#2

(#2) Complaint against AUTO MATTIC INC., EILEEN CASTILLA GEIGER, KELLY M. HARRELL, JACQUELINE C. ROMERO, TUMBLER INC., TWO UNKNOWN FEDERAL OFFICERS, U.S. DISTRICT ATTORNEY, UNITED STATES, VERIZON, INC. and WORDPRESS INC. filed by PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#1

RESTRICTED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/22/2023

DocketOrder #18 mailed to Gedeon. (fdc) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF IS DENIED. THE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE TIME TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FRCP 4(m) IS EXTENDED TO THE DATE 90 DAYS AFTER THE COURT ISSUES SUMMONSES IN THIS CASE IF SUMMONSES ARE ISSUED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/21/23. 6/22/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MOTION FOR REIEF FROM THE ORDER ISSUED ON 5/18/23 FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) MOTION TO EXTEND TIME AND FOR RECONSIDERATION/RELIEF FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDOC. NOS. #14 AND #15 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 6/15/23. (amas) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER THAT MOTIONS (8,9,10,11,12) ARE DENIED. THIS CASE REMAINS STAYED PENDING THE FINAL OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL CHARGES IN U.S. v. GIDEON, NO. 21-CR-210 (E.D.PA). THE TIME TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FRCP 4(m) IS EXTENDED TO THE DATE 90 DAYS AFTER THE COURT ISSUES SUMMONSES IN THIS CASE IF SUMMONSES ARE ISSUED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/13/23. 6/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/13/23. 6/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (mbh) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Supplemental Pleading filed by PASCAL GEDEON. (mbh) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE ORDER ISSUED ON 5/18/23 FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON. (mbh) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketDOCUMENTS 6 & 7 MAILED TO PRO SE PASCAL GEDEON. (DT) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. GEDEON SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF FDC PHILA. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. MR. GEDEON'S CLAIMS AGAINST ROMERO, HARRELL AND GEIGER ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TERMINATE ROMERO, HARRELL AND GEIGER AS DEFENDANTS. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CORRECT THE SPELLING OF DEFENDANT TUMBLR INC. ON THE DOCKET. MR. GEDEON'S MOTION FOR STANDBY COUNSEL IS DENIED AS PREMATURE. THE TIME TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FRCP IS EXTENDED TO THE DATE 90 DAYS AFTER THE COURT ISSUES SUMMONSES IN THIS CASE IF SUMMONSES RE ISSUED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/18/23. 5/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE (mbh). (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/18/23. 5/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (mbh) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketPRO SE GUIDELINESS MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, ) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES. (mbh) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by PASCAL GEDEON. (mbh) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION TO GUIDE ASSISTANCE OF STANDBY COUNSEL FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) Modified on 4/28/2023 (lvj). (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Complaint against AUTO MATTIC INC., EILEEN CASTILLA GEIGER, KELLY M. HARRELL, JACQUELINE C. ROMERO, TUMBLER INC., TWO UNKNOWN FEDERAL OFFICERS, U.S. DISTRICT ATTORNEY, UNITED STATES, VERIZON, INC. and WORDPRESS INC. filed by PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY PASCAL GEDEON.(mbh) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less