This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2023 at 08:06:20 (UTC).

SANTIAGO-BAEZ v. CASTILLO et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2023 SANTIAGO-BAEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CASTILLO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-08433

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY SANTIAGO-BAEZ

Defendants and Cross Claimants

ISAAC CASTILLO

SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC

JOHN DOE 1-100

JANE DOE 1-100

XYZ CO. 1-100

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JOHN DOE 1-100

JANE DOE 1-100

XYZ CO. 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRYAN H. MINTZ

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

JEFFREY A. SEGAL

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC from superior court -Union county, case number 1614-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14570667), filed by SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

#3

(#3) Diversity Disclosure Statement by SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

#4

(#4) Diversity Disclosure Statement by HENRY SANTIAGO-BAEZ. (MINTZ, BRYAN) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JANE DOE 1-100, JOHN DOE 1-100, XYZ CO. 1-100 by SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC, ISAAC CASTILLO.(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/22/2023

Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2023 at 1:30 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 10/26/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/22/2023. (jqb, ) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JANE DOE 1-100, JOHN DOE 1-100, XYZ CO. 1-100 by SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC, ISAAC CASTILLO.(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Diversity Disclosure Statement by HENRY SANTIAGO-BAEZ. (MINTZ, BRYAN) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Diversity Disclosure Statement by SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (dam) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC from superior court -Union county, case number 1614-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14570667), filed by SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less