This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2023 at 07:48:29 (UTC).

WALLACE v. PFIZER, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2023 WALLACE filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against PFIZER, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Leda D. Wettre and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02062

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIYA WALLACE

Defendants

PFIZER, INC.

TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

In Re

PROTON PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL J. PENNOCK

Defendant Attorney

BETH S. ROSE

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PFIZER, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14240684) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NIYA WALLACE.(PENNOCK, PAUL) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to PFIZER, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (adc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (ROSE, BETH) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

 

Docket Entries

06/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (ROSE, BETH) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketMember Case Direct File on 4/12/2023, for MDL 2789 PROTON PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II). (adc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketFor all Case Management Orders #click here (adc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to PFIZER, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (adc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PFIZER, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14240684) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NIYA WALLACE.(PENNOCK, PAUL) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less