This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2023 at 07:35:23 (UTC).

Lanier v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Lanier filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01742

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vera Lanier

Defendants

C.R. Bard, Inc.

Davol, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert E. Price

Defendant Attorney

William Darrell Kloss, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9438569), filed by Vera Lanier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Price, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Short Form ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc.. (Kloss, William) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Vera Lanier. (Price, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2023
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (daf) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Vera Lanier. (Price, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Short Form ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc.. (Kloss, William) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9438569), filed by Vera Lanier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Price, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less