This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2023 at 08:37:35 (UTC).

RICHARTZ et al v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2023 RICHARTZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-03584

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAUL RICHARTZ

LINDA RICHARTZ

Defendants

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CORPORATION

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORPORATION

PFIZER INC.

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC

GLAXOSMITHKLINE (AMERICA) INC.

GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC

PATHEON MANUFACTURING SERVICES LLC

L. PERRIGO CO.

PERRIGO COMPANY

PERRIGO RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC.

DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VINCENT CHENG

Defendant Attorneys

TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY

MARK K. SILVER

LIZA M. WALSH

CAROLINE POWER

CHRISTOPHER R. CARTON

JOHN CHRISTIE MCMEEKIN, II

APRIL CAMPOS

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-005126-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14431501), filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3, #6 Exhibit 3 - Part 4, #7 Exhibit 3 - Part 5, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Part 1

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Part 2

1 #5

Exhibit 3 - Part 3

1 #6

Exhibit 3 - Part 4

1 #7

Exhibit 3 - Part 5

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (DUFFY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT CHENG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CHENG, VINCENT) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

#5

(#5) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-118) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida. (jjc, ) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/04/2023

DocketCase transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Southern District of Florida as case 9:23-cv-81118. (mg) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketCase electronically transferred to the USDC for the Southern District of Florida. (jjc, ) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-118) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida. (jjc, ) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT CHENG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CHENG, VINCENT) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: All defendants were not added to the docket. When entering parties make sure to add ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS as found on the original state court complaint. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (kht) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (DUFFY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-005126-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14431501), filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3, #6 Exhibit 3 - Part 4, #7 Exhibit 3 - Part 5, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less