This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 12:54:06 (UTC).

Haydi Fernandez v. American Express National Bank et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Haydi Fernandez filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against American Express National Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-01721

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Haydi Fernandez

Defendants

American Express National Bank

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Transunion, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garrett Forrester Charity

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen J Newman

Alina Gatto

Kja Kelike Shelene Harper-Gopaul

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alina Gatto counsel for Defendant American Express National Bank. Alina Gatto is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alina Gatto. (Gatto, Alina) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant American Express National Bank identifying American Express Company as Corporate Parent. (Edep, Alina) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Express National Bank answer now due 11/30/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Express National Bank.(Attorney Alina Edep added to party American Express National Bank(pty:dft))(Edep, Alina) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

15 #1

Summons Returned Executed

#15

(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Haydi Fernandez, upon Defendant American Express National Bank served on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 10/9/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed)(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Harper-Gopaul, Kja) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 11/29/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Kja Kelike Shelene Harper-Gopaul added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Harper-Gopaul, Kja) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Haydi Fernandez. upon Transunion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Haydi Fernandez. upon Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

#10

(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-01721-DOC (ADSx). (dgo) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:23-cv-01721 JVS(ADSx). (rn) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#7

(#7) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Haydi Fernandez. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants American Express National Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

5 #1

CV11C

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil) (Entered: 09/17/2023)

4 #1

Summons (Experian)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36049009 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Haydi Fernandez. (Attorney Garrett Forrester Charity added to party Haydi Fernandez(pty:pla))(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alina Gatto counsel for Defendant American Express National Bank. Alina Gatto is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alina Gatto. (Gatto, Alina) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant American Express National Bank identifying American Express Company as Corporate Parent. (Edep, Alina) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Express National Bank answer now due 11/30/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Express National Bank.(Attorney Alina Edep added to party American Express National Bank(pty:dft))(Edep, Alina) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Haydi Fernandez, upon Defendant American Express National Bank served on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 10/9/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed)(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Harper-Gopaul, Kja) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 11/29/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Kja Kelike Shelene Harper-Gopaul added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Harper-Gopaul, Kja) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Haydi Fernandez. upon Transunion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Haydi Fernandez. upon Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-01721-DOC (ADSx). (dgo) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:23-cv-01721 JVS(ADSx). (rn) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Haydi Fernandez. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants American Express National Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil) (Entered: 09/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Haydi Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Experian), #2 Summons (Equifax), #3 Summons (TransUnion))(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Haydi Fernandez, (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Haydi Fernandez. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36049009 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Haydi Fernandez. (Attorney Garrett Forrester Charity added to party Haydi Fernandez(pty:pla))(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less