This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2023 at 07:38:21 (UTC).

Green Street Ventures, LLC v. Evanston Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/13/2023 Green Street Ventures, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Evanston Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lance M Africk and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01249

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lance M Africk

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Green Street Ventures, LLC

Defendant

Evanston Insurance Company

Interested Party

Hurricane Ida Program Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Philip Glago

Jatavian L. Williams

Katherine Elaine May

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan P. Telep

Douglas M. Kleeman

Interested Party Attorney

Francis Joseph Lobrano

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-01162 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9893840) filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Ryan P. Telep added to party Evanston Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Telep, Ryan) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Evanston Insurance Company. By Clerk.(ko) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#4

(#4) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(ko) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#5

(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Telep, Ryan) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Evanston Insurance Company answer due 5/10/2023. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 04/19/2023. (ko) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Evanston Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Telep, Ryan) Modified text/link on 5/1/2023 (js). (Entered: 04/28/2023)

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #2

Exhibit B

#8

(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Evanston Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Company (Telep, Ryan) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by Evanston Insurance Company.(Telep, Ryan) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Evanston Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Company (Telep, Ryan) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Evanston Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Telep, Ryan) Modified text/link on 5/1/2023 (js). (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Evanston Insurance Company answer due 5/10/2023. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 04/19/2023. (ko) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Telep, Ryan) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(ko) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Evanston Insurance Company. By Clerk.(ko) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-01162 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9893840) filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Ryan P. Telep added to party Evanston Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Telep, Ryan) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less