This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2023 at 07:45:03 (UTC).

Pool v. Aegis Security Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/28/2023 Pool filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Aegis Security Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Erin Wilder-Doomes and Shelly D. Dick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-01011

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Pool

Defendant

Aegis Security Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heather Charlene Ford

Defendant Attorneys

Wayne R. Maldonado

Brett Foster Willie

Warren Joseph Greenwood, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2626818.), filed by Mary Pool. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Certification Letter)(Ford, Heather) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Attachment Certification Letter

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Mary Pool identifying Affiliate/Interested Person McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Mary Pool, Affiliate/Interested Person Law Office of Heather C. Ford, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Aegis Security Insurance Company for Mary Pool. (Ford, Heather) (Entered: 09/09/2023)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Aegis Security Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Persons)(Maldonado, Wayne) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

4 #1

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order

4 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Interested Persons

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Persons by Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Maldonado, Wayne) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/12/2023) (EDC). Modified on 10/12/2023 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 10/11/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Persons by Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Maldonado, Wayne) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/12/2023) (EDC). Modified on 10/12/2023 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (NLT) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER: The #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, filed by Defendant Aegis Security Insurance Company is denied. Although Local Civil Rule 7(a) permits a 21-day extension, the document does not contain either the date of service or the proposed requested date of the extension for the Court to calculate the deadline. The denial is without prejudice to Defendant filing a request for extension with adequate information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/11/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BLR) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Aegis Security Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Persons)(Maldonado, Wayne) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Mary Pool identifying Affiliate/Interested Person McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Mary Pool, Affiliate/Interested Person Law Office of Heather C. Ford, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Aegis Security Insurance Company for Mary Pool. (Ford, Heather) (Entered: 09/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. OR Failure to add all listed interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (LLH) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2626818.), filed by Mary Pool. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Certification Letter)(Ford, Heather) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less