This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2023 at 06:09:02 (UTC).

Dali Wireless, Inc. v. AT&T Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 Dali Wireless, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Schroeder, III and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00246

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Schroeder, III

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dali Wireless, Inc.

Defendants

AT&T Corp.

AT&T Communications LLC

AT&T Mobility

AT&T Mobility II LLC

AT&T Services Inc.

CommScope Holding Company, Inc.

Commscope, Inc.

CommScope Technologies LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea Leigh Fair

Claire Abernathy Henry

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc., CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope Technologies LLC, Commscope, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9523550.), filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#4

(#4) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Dali Wireless, Inc. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Dali Wireless, Inc. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#6

(#6) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dali Wireless, Inc. (Leffler, Cristofer) Modified on 7/19/2023 (ch, ). (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dali Wireless, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/23/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

#9

(#9) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/23/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dali Wireless, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 6, Notice of Dismissal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dali Wireless, Inc. (Leffler, Cristofer) Modified on 7/19/2023 (ch, ). (Entered: 07/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Dali Wireless, Inc. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Dali Wireless, Inc. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc., CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope Technologies LLC, Commscope, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9523550.), filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less