This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2023 at 07:14:54 (UTC).

Redwood Technologies, LLC v. Texas Instruments Incorporated

Case Summary

On March 29, 2023, Redwood Technologies, LLC (“Redwood” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Patrick J. Conroy, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Texas Instruments Incorporated (“TI” or “Defendant”), seeking declaratory relief for alleged infringement of U.S. patents owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas.

Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. patent Nos. 7,359,457 (the “ʼ457 patent”), 7,688,901 (the “ʼ901 patent”), 7,974,371 (the “ʼ371 patent”), 8,284,866 (the “ʼ866 patent”) and 9,374,209 (the “ʼ209 patent”) (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”).

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged, “TI has and continues to directly and/or indirectly infringe (by inducing infringement) one or more claims of the ’457 patent in this judicial district and elsewhere in Texas and the United States. TI directly infringes the ʼ457 patent via 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) by making, using, offering for sale, selling, and/or importing the Accused Products, their components and processes, and/or products containing the same that incorporate the fundamental technologies covered by the ’457 patent.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “The Accused Products, including the WL1807MOD, each comprise circuitry and/or components (hardware and/or software) that determine a modulation system from among a plurality of modulation systems based on a communication situation. The Accused Products, including the WL1807MOD, each comprise circuitry and/or components (hardware and/or software) that modulate a digital transmission signal according to the modulation system previously determined and generates a first symbol. The first symbol comprises a first quadrature baseband signal.”

Plaintiff additionally alleged, “On information and belief, despite having knowledge of the ’457 patent and knowledge that it is directly and/or indirectly infringing one or more claims of the ’457 patent, TI has nevertheless continued its infringing conduct and disregarded an objectively high likelihood of infringement. TI’s infringing activities relative to the ’457 patent have been, and continue to be, willful, wanton, malicious, in bad-faith, deliberate, consciously wrongful, flagrant, characteristic of a pirate, and an egregious case of misconduct beyond typical infringement such that Plaintiff is entitled under 35 U.S.C. § 284 to enhanced damages up to three times the amount found or assessed.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “TI has and continues to directly and/or indirectly infringe (by inducing infringement) one or more claims of the ’901 patent in this judicial district and elsewhere in Texas and the United States. TI directly infringes the ’901 patent via 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) by using and/or testing the Accused Products, their components and processes, and/or products containing the same that incorporate the fundamental technologies covered by the ’901 patent.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “Redwood is entitled to recover from TI the damages sustained by Plaintiff as a result of TI’s wrongful acts, and willful infringement, in an amount subject to proof at trial, which, by law, cannot be less than a reasonable royalty, together with interest and costs as fixed by this Court.” 

Plaintiff stated five claims for relief for the alleged infringement of the Asserted Patents owned by the plaintiff. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested declaratory relief and an award of damages together with pre- and post-judgment interest and costs incurred by the plaintiff.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00135

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Redwood Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Texas Instruments Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas William Kennedy, Jr

Patrick Joseph Conroy

John Paul Murphy

Jonathan Hart Rastegar

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Aline Abraham

Jack Wesley Hill

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Texas Instruments Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9427707.), filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Instruments Incorporated. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Harbor Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent Monument IP Fund 2, LLC for Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Paul Murphy on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Murphy, John) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas William Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Kennedy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Redwood Technologies, LLC. Texas Instruments Incorporated served on 3/31/2023, answer due 4/21/2023. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Texas Instruments Incorporated.(Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Patrick Joseph Conroy on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Aline Abraham on behalf of Texas Instruments Incorporated (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Aline Abraham on behalf of Texas Instruments Incorporated (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Patrick Joseph Conroy on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Texas Instruments Incorporated to 6/5/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Texas Instruments Incorporated.(Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Redwood Technologies, LLC. Texas Instruments Incorporated served on 3/31/2023, answer due 4/21/2023. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas William Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Kennedy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Paul Murphy on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Murphy, John) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Harbor Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent Monument IP Fund 2, LLC for Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Instruments Incorporated. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Texas Instruments Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9427707.), filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less