This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2023 at 07:47:57 (UTC).

Patent Armory Inc. v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On May 5, 2023, Patent Armory Inc. (“Plaintiff”) represented by Isaac Rabicoff of Rabicoff Law LLC, filed an intellectual property rights lawsuit against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking declaratory relief and damages for alleged infringement of the U.S. Patent. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas.

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged, “The ’413 Patent is entitled ‘Wireless communication device with integrated electromagnetic radiation sensors,’ and issued 2012-09-25. The application leading to the ’413 Patent was filed on 2011-11-22.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “The ’112 Patent is entitled ‘Mobile communication device with electromagnetic radiation sensors,’ and issued 2014-09-02. The application leading to the ’112 Patent was filed on 2014-02-26. ”

The plaintiff also alleged, “Defendant also has and continues to directly infringe, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Exemplary ’413 Patent Claims, by having its employees internally test and use these Exemplary Products.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “Despite such actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ’413 Patent. On information and belief, Defendant has also continued to sell the Exemplary Defendant Products and distribute product literature and website materials inducing end users and others to use its products in the customary and intended manner that infringes the ’413 Patent.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “Direct Infringement. Defendant directly infringed one or more claims of the ’112 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the ‘Exemplary Defendant Products’) that infringed at least the exemplary claims of the ’112 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the ‘Exemplary ’112 Patent Claims’) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringed the claims of the ’112 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “Defendant also directly infringed, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Exemplary ’112 Patent Claims, by having its employees internally test and use these Exemplary Products.”

Plaintiff presented one claim for relief from alleged infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,275,413 and 8,825,112.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested declaratory relief and an award of damages with pre- or post-judgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00326

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patent Armory Inc.

Defendant

LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

9 #6

Exhibit 6

9 #5

Exhibit 5

9 #4

Exhibit 4

9 #3

Exhibit 3

9 #2

Exhibit 2

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. amending #1 Complaint,., filed by Patent Armory Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patent Armory Inc.. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 5/11/2023, answer due 6/1/2023. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time for Plaintiff LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to 7/17/23 by Patent Armory Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17404794), filed by Patent Armory Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. amending #1 Complaint,., filed by Patent Armory Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketReset Deadlines: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer due 7/17/2023. (lad) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patent Armory Inc.. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 5/11/2023, answer due 6/1/2023. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #7 Notice (Other) Without a Summons Returned Executed filed in this case, we do not have a due date for the answer and therefore cannot reset the answer due date as noticed. Please file a Motion for the extension. (lad) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time for Plaintiff LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to 7/17/23 by Patent Armory Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated Standing Orders: #Order Regarding Court Docket Management and #Amended Standing Order for Pretrial Procedure. Both orders are available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Patent Armory Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Patent Armory Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Patent Armory Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17404794), filed by Patent Armory Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less