This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2023 at 12:56:11 (UTC).

Antsy Labs, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 Antsy Labs, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisette M. Reid and Roy K. Altman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-23571

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antsy Labs, LLC

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Fumana

anyangnaiyan (89)

Ausonsure (90)

Bliweek Direct (91)

Chuchik Toys (92)

DOMILA STORE (95)

EA Gifts and Crafts Co., LTD (96)

FIMIJORY (97)

Hiboom US (98)

Honmofun Directly (99)

Hstqevo (100)

JIUHU (101)

Keyile (103)

Kunsai.store (104)

Maikangxin (105)

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rossana Baeza

Defendant Attorney

David P. Reiner, II

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

#66

(#66) ORDER Dismissing Party afccam (134), israeli_first_aid_shy_halat (152), SMALL FISH (111) and SlydUK (195) 5 as identified on Schedule A are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE these Defendants from the case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

#63

RESTRICTED

62 #2

Schedule A

62 #1

Declaration of Rossana Baeza

#62

(#62) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A by Antsy Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rossana Baeza, #2 Schedule A)(Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

#61

(#61) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Defendant Nos. 111, 134, 152, and 195. by Antsy Labs, LLC (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

#60

(#60) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants [ECF No. #59 ]. Order Dismissing Party deng08 (117), hy0110 (121), jescakoo (122), ren08 (127), DoDoMagXanadu (94) and T3DWorkshop (199) Defendants 94, 117, 121, 122, 127, and 199 as identified on Schedule A are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE these Defendants from the case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

#59

(#59) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Defendant Nos. 94, 117, 121, 122, 127, and 199 by Antsy Labs, LLC (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 11/10/2023)

#6

(#10) ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re #6 Ex Parte Motion, filed by Antsy Labs, LLC. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/26/2023. (amb) Modified by unsealing document on 10/31/2023 per DE 43 Order (kpe). (Entered: 09/27/2023)

#5

(#5) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Antsy Labs, LLC (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/20/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Complaint

#3

(#3) FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (nan) A copy of all documents were mailed to the Director of U.S. Copyright Office. (Entered: 09/18/2023)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 to Complaint (Copyright)

#1

(#58) ORDER. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants [ECF No. #57 ]. Defendants Coogam Direct and Thorns Outdoor (Nos. 93 and 112 on Schedule A) areDISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE these Defendants from the case.Defendant Coogam Direct's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint [ECF No. #55 ] and Lance Liu's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice[ECF No. #56 ] are DENIED as moot. Motions terminated: #55 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Coogam Direct (93), #56 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lance Y. Liu. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17056608 filed by Coogam Direct (93). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/8/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#67) ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#66) ORDER Dismissing Party afccam (134), israeli_first_aid_shy_halat (152), SMALL FISH (111) and SlydUK (195) 5 as identified on Schedule A are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE these Defendants from the case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#65) Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re #63 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default,. Correction Other. Image added in Error by Clerk. (drz) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

Docket(#64) Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/13/2023. (drz) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#63) Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A - Motions Terminated: #62 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/13/2023. (drz) (drz). (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#62) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A by Antsy Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rossana Baeza, #2 Schedule A)(Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#61) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Defendant Nos. 111, 134, 152, and 195. by Antsy Labs, LLC (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#60) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants [ECF No. #59 ]. Order Dismissing Party deng08 (117), hy0110 (121), jescakoo (122), ren08 (127), DoDoMagXanadu (94) and T3DWorkshop (199) Defendants 94, 117, 121, 122, 127, and 199 as identified on Schedule A are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE these Defendants from the case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#59) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Defendant Nos. 94, 117, 121, 122, 127, and 199 by Antsy Labs, LLC (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 11/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#58) ORDER. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants [ECF No. #57 ]. Defendants Coogam Direct and Thorns Outdoor (Nos. 93 and 112 on Schedule A) areDISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE these Defendants from the case.Defendant Coogam Direct's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint [ECF No. #55 ] and Lance Liu's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice[ECF No. #56 ] are DENIED as moot. Motions terminated: #55 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Coogam Direct (93), #56 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lance Y. Liu. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17056608 filed by Coogam Direct (93). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/8/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re #6 Ex Parte Motion, filed by Antsy Labs, LLC. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/26/2023. (amb) Modified by unsealing document on 10/31/2023 per DE 43 Order (kpe). (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Antsy Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Antsy Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rossana Baeza, #2 Proposed Order) (Baeza, Rossana) Modified by unsealing document on 10/31/2023 per DE 43 Order (kpe). (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Included a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Internet Stores, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery by Antsy Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark McLachlan, #2 Proposed Order) (Baeza, Rossana) Modified by unsealing document on 10/31/2023 per DE 43 Order (kpe). (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Antsy Labs, LLC (Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/20/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (nan) A copy of all documents were mailed to the Director of U.S. Copyright Office. (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16925467, filed by Antsy Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint (Copyright), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baeza, Rossana) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less