This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2023 at 08:53:34 (UTC).

Matos-Mendez v. Drake et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2023 Matos-Mendez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Drake. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric N. Vitaliano and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-05937

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nilson Matos-Mendez

Defendants

Kevin Drake

Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boris Humberto Linares

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey A. Segal

Ian Kingsley

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC from State of NY county of Kings, case number 521126/2023. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16962625) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-E) (Segal, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2023: #4 Amended Civil Cover Sheet Submitted 8-4-23, See Document 5) (TLH). (Entered: 08/04/2023)

1 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit A-E

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

#5

(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Amended Case Information Sheet (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin Drake, Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC. (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for October 4, 2023 at 4:30 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 INDIVIDUAL RULES, #2 IC QUESTIONNAIRE) (JM) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

7 #1

INDIVIDUAL RULES

7 #2

IC QUESTIONNAIRE

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Kingsley on behalf of Kevin Drake, Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Kingsley on behalf of Kevin Drake, Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for October 4, 2023 at 4:30 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 INDIVIDUAL RULES, #2 IC QUESTIONNAIRE) (JM) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin Drake, Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC. (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Amended Case Information Sheet (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (SR) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC from State of NY county of Kings, case number 521126/2023. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16962625) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-E) (Segal, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2023: #4 Amended Civil Cover Sheet Submitted 8-4-23, See Document 5) (TLH). (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less