This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2023 at 13:10:28 (UTC).

Koji IP, LLC v. Renesas Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2023 Koji IP, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Renesas Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01674

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Koji IP, LLC

Defendant

Renesas Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Defendant Attorney

Jason A. Crotty

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE re #16 Declaration, Revised Exhibit A by Defendant Renesas Electronics America, Inc. (Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

16 #2

Exhibit B

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) DECLARATION of Jason A. Crotty regarding MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement #14 by Defendant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#15

(#15) DECLARATION of Katie O'Sullivan regarding MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement #14 by Defendant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement by Defendant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Renesas Electronics Corporation for Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason A. Crotty on behalf of Renesas Electronics America, Inc.Attorney Jason A. Crotty added to party Renesas Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

10 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Plaintiff Koji IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koji IP, LLC. Renesas Electronics America, Inc. served on 7/5/2023, answer due 7/26/2023. (Kalra, Susan) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

#7

(#7) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (norlin, ) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

6 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, ) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Renesas Electronics America, Inc. by Plaintiff Koji IP, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent (AO-120) by Plaintiff Koji IP, LLC (Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) NOTICE re #16 Declaration, Revised Exhibit A by Defendant Renesas Electronics America, Inc. (Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) DECLARATION of Jason A. Crotty regarding MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement #14 by Defendant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) DECLARATION of Katie O'Sullivan regarding MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement #14 by Defendant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement by Defendant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Renesas Electronics Corporation for Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason A. Crotty on behalf of Renesas Electronics America, Inc.Attorney Jason A. Crotty added to party Renesas Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Crotty, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Renesas Electronics America, may have to and including 8/25/2023, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/7/2023. Text Only Entry(skclc1) (Entered: 08/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Plaintiff Koji IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koji IP, LLC. Renesas Electronics America, Inc. served on 7/5/2023, answer due 7/26/2023. (Kalra, Susan) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

Docket(#8) DISREGARD Filed by clerk in Error Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a)oAll State court documents were not submitted.See Appendix B Notice of Removal in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) Modified on 7/7/2023 to correct docket (norlin, ). (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (norlin, ) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, ) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Renesas Electronics America, Inc. by Plaintiff Koji IP, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent (AO-120) by Plaintiff Koji IP, LLC (Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Renesas Electronics America, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9176342)Attorney William P. Ramey, III added to party Koji IP, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Koji IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less