This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2023 at 07:13:54 (UTC).

P & F Brother Industrial Corporation v. Lowes Companies, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2023 P F Brother Industrial Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lowes Companies, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00313

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

P & F Brother Industrial Corporation

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Lowes Companies, Inc.,

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

James Francis McDonough, III

Carey Matthew Rozier

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Eric Hugh Findlay

Tasneem Amin Dharamsi

Timothy David StClair

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/17/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

#13

(#13) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc., (StClair, Timothy) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against P & F Brother Industrial Corporation by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc.,.(StClair, Timothy) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

1 #14

Supplement Proposed Summons

1 #13

Supplement Proposed Summons

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit K.Lowes Notice Letter

1 #10

Exhibit J.Website: Lowes Delta Shopmaster S36-295

1 #9

Exhibit I.Website: Lowes Kobalt KT10152

1 #8

Exhibit H.Website: Lowes Delta 36-6022

1 #7

Exhibit G.Website: Lowes Delta 36-725T2

1 #6

Exhibit F.Website: Lowes Delta 36-725

1 #5

Exhibit E.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5152T2

1 #4

Exhibit D.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5100T2

1 #3

Exhibit C.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5052T2

1 #2

Exhibit B.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5000T2

1 #1

Exhibit A.U.S. Patent No. 7,475,622

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9574513.), filed by P & F Brother Industrial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.U.S. Patent No. 7,475,622, #2 Exhibit B.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5000T2, #3 Exhibit C.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5052T2, #4 Exhibit D.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5100T2, #5 Exhibit E.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5152T2, #6 Exhibit F.Website: Lowes Delta 36-725, #7 Exhibit G.Website: Lowes Delta 36-725T2, #8 Exhibit H.Website: Lowes Delta 36-6022, #9 Exhibit I.Website: Lowes Kobalt KT10152, #10 Exhibit J.Website: Lowes Delta Shopmaster S36-295, #11 Exhibit K.Lowes Notice Letter, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Supplement Proposed Summons, #14 Supplement Proposed Summons)(Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/17/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc., (StClair, Timothy) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against P & F Brother Industrial Corporation by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc.,.(StClair, Timothy) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Francis McDonough, III on behalf of P & F Brother Industrial Corporation (McDonough, James) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tasneem Amin Dharamsi on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc., (Dharamsi, Tasneem) (Entered: 08/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy David StClair on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc., (StClair, Timothy) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc., (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC to 8/16/2023. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re P & F Brother Industrial Corporation.( Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lowes Companies, Inc., to 8/16/2023. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Defendant Lowe's Companies, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re P & F Brother Industrial Corporation.( Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE by P & F Brother Industrial Corporation re #4 Summons Issued of Return of Service Executed (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Additional Attachment(s))(ch, ) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by P & F Brother Industrial Corporation (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9574513.), filed by P & F Brother Industrial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.U.S. Patent No. 7,475,622, #2 Exhibit B.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5000T2, #3 Exhibit C.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5052T2, #4 Exhibit D.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5100T2, #5 Exhibit E.Website: Lowes Delta 36-5152T2, #6 Exhibit F.Website: Lowes Delta 36-725, #7 Exhibit G.Website: Lowes Delta 36-725T2, #8 Exhibit H.Website: Lowes Delta 36-6022, #9 Exhibit I.Website: Lowes Kobalt KT10152, #10 Exhibit J.Website: Lowes Delta Shopmaster S36-295, #11 Exhibit K.Lowes Notice Letter, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Supplement Proposed Summons, #14 Supplement Proposed Summons)(Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less