3:23-CV-04704
09/13/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Civil Right - Employment Discrimination
Edward M Chen
The California Labor and Workforce Development Agency
David Sandak
Comerica Bank
Comerica Incorporated
Comerica Management Company, Inc.
Brent A Robinson
Brent Alan Robinson
Reed W. L. Marcy
Hallie Von Rock
Lisseth Bayona
Randall Bruce Aiman-Smith
Ruwani Namal Munaweera Tantula
Emma Catherine Husseman
Michael Thomas Campbell
Tracey A Kennedy
(#15) Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #14 Motion to Remand.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2023) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Remand
(#14) Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated, Comerica Management Company, Inc.. Responses due by 11/6/2023. Replies due by 11/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Remand)(Campbell, Michael) (Filed on 10/23/2023) (Entered: 10/23/2023)
Proposed Order
Declaration of Brent A. Robinson
(#13) MOTION to Remand filed by David Sandak, The California Labor and Workforce Development Agency. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 10/27/2023. Replies due by 11/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent A. Robinson, #2 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Brent) (Filed on 10/13/2023) (Entered: 10/13/2023)
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 9/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2023) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/23. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2023) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated, Comerica Management Company, Inc... (Campbell, Michael) (Filed on 9/25/2023) (Entered: 09/25/2023)
(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Sandak, The California Labor and Workforce Development Agency.. (Robinson, Brent) (Filed on 9/25/2023) (Entered: 09/25/2023)
(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
(#4) Declaration of Sean Brubaker in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Comerica Bank, A Texas Corporation, Comerica Incorporated, a Delaware corporation, Comerica Management Company, Inc., a Michigan corporation. (Campbell, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2023) Modified on 9/14/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/13/2023)
Certificate/Proof of Service
Civil Cover Sheet
Exhibit Removal Exhibits A to C
(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court - County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-23-606913. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18640316). Filed byComerica Incorporated, a Delaware corporation, Comerica Bank, A Texas Corporation, Comerica Management Company, Inc., a Michigan corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Removal Exhibits A to C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Campbell, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
Docket(#15) Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #14 Motion to Remand.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2023) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated, Comerica Management Company, Inc.. Responses due by 11/6/2023. Replies due by 11/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Remand)(Campbell, Michael) (Filed on 10/23/2023) (Entered: 10/23/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) MOTION to Remand filed by David Sandak, The California Labor and Workforce Development Agency. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 10/27/2023. Replies due by 11/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent A. Robinson, #2 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Brent) (Filed on 10/13/2023) (Entered: 10/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE. You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Edward M. Chen upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chens Standing Orders and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2024, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 1:20 PM.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2023) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 9/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2023) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/23. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2023) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023) (Entered: 09/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated, Comerica Management Company, Inc... (Campbell, Michael) (Filed on 9/25/2023) (Entered: 09/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Sandak, The California Labor and Workforce Development Agency.. (Robinson, Brent) (Filed on 9/25/2023) (Entered: 09/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #4 Affidavit, filed by Comerica Bank, Comerica Management Company, Inc., Comerica Incorporated (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Declaration of Sean Brubaker in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Comerica Bank, A Texas Corporation, Comerica Incorporated, a Delaware corporation, Comerica Management Company, Inc., a Michigan corporation. (Campbell, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2023) Modified on 9/14/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Comerica Bank, A Texas Corporation, Comerica Incorporated, a Delaware corporation, Comerica Management Company, Inc., a Michigan corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Campbell, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Comerica Bank, A Texas Corporation, Comerica Incorporated, a Delaware corporation, Comerica Management Company, Inc., a Michigan corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Campbell, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court - County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-23-606913. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18640316). Filed byComerica Incorporated, a Delaware corporation, Comerica Bank, A Texas Corporation, Comerica Management Company, Inc., a Michigan corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Removal Exhibits A to C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Campbell, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read Less