This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2023 at 07:50:27 (UTC).

Manuel Bernal v. Motts, LLP et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 Manuel Bernal filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Motts, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fred W. Slaughter and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00848

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred W. Slaughter

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manuel Bernal

Defendants

Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.

Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.

Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.

Motts, LLP

DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bruce Zareh Kokozian

Alex Karl DiBona

Defendant Attorneys

Rod M Fliegel

Angela J Rafoth

Nasim Tourkaman

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Berrnardino Superior, case number CIVSB2303104 Receipt No: ACACDC-35297986 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Mott's, LLP, Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Sheet, #2 Exhibit B- Proofs of Service of Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Defendants' Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Nasim Tourkaman added to party Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nasim Tourkaman added to party Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nasim Tourkaman added to party Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nasim Tourkaman added to party Mott's, LLP(pty:dft))(Tourkaman, Nasim) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B- Proofs of Service of Summons & Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C- Defendants' Answer to Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Mott's, LLP. (Tourkaman, Nasim) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#3

(#3) Notice of Interested Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Section 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendants Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Mott's, LLP. (Tourkaman, Nasim) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rod M Fliegel counsel for Defendants Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Mott's, LLP. Adding Rod M. Fliegel as counsel of record for Defendants MOTTS LLP, KEURIG DR PEPPER INC., DR PEPPER/SEVEN UP, INC., and DR PEPPER SNAPPLE GROUP, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants MOTTS LLP, KEURIG DR PEPPER INC., DR PEPPER/SEVEN UP, INC., and DR PEPPER SNAPPLE GROUP, INC.. (Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Mott's, LLP(pty:dft))(Fliegel, Rod) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-00848 FWS (SHKx). (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

#8

(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#10

(#10) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Manuel Bernal.. (Kokozian, Bruce) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by plaintiff Manuel Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kokozian, Bruce) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court #11 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter the following: (1) The above-captioned case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of San Bernardino County, State of California, for all further proceedings. (See document for further information). The Parties shall bear their respective fees and costs related to the remand of this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino County Superior Court. Case number: CIVSB2303104. (jp) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court #11 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter the following: (1) The above-captioned case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of San Bernardino County, State of California, for all further proceedings. (See document for further information). The Parties shall bear their respective fees and costs related to the remand of this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by plaintiff Manuel Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kokozian, Bruce) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Manuel Bernal.. (Kokozian, Bruce) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-00848 FWS (SHKx). (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Motts, LLP in San Bernardino Superior Court on 5/10/2023, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Manuel Bernal in San Bernardino Superior Court on 1/18/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rod M Fliegel counsel for Defendants Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Mott's, LLP. Adding Rod M. Fliegel as counsel of record for Defendants MOTTS LLP, KEURIG DR PEPPER INC., DR PEPPER/SEVEN UP, INC., and DR PEPPER SNAPPLE GROUP, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants MOTTS LLP, KEURIG DR PEPPER INC., DR PEPPER/SEVEN UP, INC., and DR PEPPER SNAPPLE GROUP, INC.. (Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Mott's, LLP(pty:dft))(Fliegel, Rod) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Interested Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Section 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendants Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Mott's, LLP. (Tourkaman, Nasim) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Mott's, LLP. (Tourkaman, Nasim) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Berrnardino Superior, case number CIVSB2303104 Receipt No: ACACDC-35297986 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc., Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Mott's, LLP, Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Sheet, #2 Exhibit B- Proofs of Service of Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Defendants' Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Nasim Tourkaman added to party Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nasim Tourkaman added to party Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nasim Tourkaman added to party Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nasim Tourkaman added to party Mott's, LLP(pty:dft))(Tourkaman, Nasim) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less