This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2023 at 08:25:52 (UTC).

Lane et al v Abbott Laboratories

Case Summary

On 04/27/2023 Lane filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02505

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sophia Lane

Kelsey Lane

Defendant

Abbott Laboratories

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julie Lamkin

Defendant Attorneys

Bridget Kathleen O'Connor

Meir Feder

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9795408 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kelsey Lane, Sophia Lane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Lamkin, Julie) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/27/2023.] (Entered: 04/06/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Form

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/27/2023.] (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#4

(#4) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 40 in MDL Case 3026 received from the Northern District of Illinois requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/27/2023.] (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#6

(#6) RECEIVED from Massachusetts; Case Number 1:23-cv-10740 (gcy) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) MAILED MDL Transfer in Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

 

Docket Entries

05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MAILED MDL Transfer in Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) RECEIVED from Massachusetts; Case Number 1:23-cv-10740 (gcy) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

Docket(#5) Case transferred to the District of Northern Illinois pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 4/20/2023. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/27/2023.] (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 40 in MDL Case 3026 received from the Northern District of Illinois requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/27/2023.] (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/27/2023.] (Entered: 04/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023

Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/27/2023.] (Entered: 04/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9795408 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kelsey Lane, Sophia Lane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Lamkin, Julie) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/27/2023.] (Entered: 04/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less