This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2023 at 13:37:09 (UTC).

Arch Insurance Company v. A3 Development, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 Arch Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A3 Development, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-23524

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arch Insurance Company

Defendants

A3 Development, LLC

A3 North Development, LLC

A3 Amenities, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Etcheverry

Jeffrey Scott Geller

Defendant Attorney

Michael John Kurzman

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Exhibit Proposed Agreed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by A3 Amenities, LLC, A3 Development, LLC, A3 North Development, LLC. Attorney Michael John Kurzman added to party A3 Amenities, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael John Kurzman added to party A3 Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael John Kurzman added to party A3 North Development, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Order)(Kurzman, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Arch Insurance Company. A3 North Development, LLC served on 9/22/2023, response/answer due 10/13/2023. (Etcheverry, Edward) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

1 #16

Exhibit L

1 #15

Exhibit K

1 #13

Exhibit I

1 #12

Exhibit H

1 #11

Exhibit G

1 #10

Exhibit F

1 #8

Exhibit D

1 #7

Exhibit C

1 #6

Exhibit B

1 #5

Exhibit A

1 #4

Summon(s) A3 Amenities

1 #3

Summon(s) A3 North Dev

1 #2

Summon(s) A3 Dev

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2023

DocketSet Response Due Deadline per DE 12 Order: A3 Amenities, LLC response due 11/15/2023; A3 Development, LLC response due 11/15/2023; A3 North Development, LLC response due 11/15/2023. (kpe) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #10 . Defendants shall have until November 15, 2023 to file a Response. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ab04) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by A3 Amenities, LLC, A3 Development, LLC, A3 North Development, LLC. Attorney Michael John Kurzman added to party A3 Amenities, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael John Kurzman added to party A3 Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael John Kurzman added to party A3 North Development, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Order)(Kurzman, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Arch Insurance Company. A3 North Development, LLC served on 9/22/2023, response/answer due 10/13/2023. (Etcheverry, Edward) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Arch Insurance Company. A3 Development, LLC served on 9/22/2023, response/answer due 10/13/2023. (Etcheverry, Edward) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Arch Insurance Company. A3 Amenities, LLC served on 9/22/2023, response/answer due 10/13/2023. (Etcheverry, Edward) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE: Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, within seven (7) days of perfecting service upon Defendants, Plaintiff shall file proof of such service with the Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Arch Insurance Company (Etcheverry, Edward) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/15/2023. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to A3 Amenities, LLC, A3 Development, LLC, and A3 North Development, LLC. (caw) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

Docket(#2) Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16919246, filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) A3 Dev, #3 Summon(s) A3 North Dev, #4 Summon(s) A3 Amenities, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L)(Etcheverry, Edward) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less