This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2023 at 09:52:56 (UTC).

Payne et al v. State Farm Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 Payne filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is L Scott Coogler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:23-CV-01193

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

L Scott Coogler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ann Payne

Danielle Welden

Defendants

State Farm Insurance Company

Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Geoffrey Dillard

Michael Paul Russ

Defendant Attorneys

Brooke Layton Messina

Margaret H Loveman

Katherine T Powell

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/4/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2024. Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2024. Jury Trial is set for 9/3/2024 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/1/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

#21

(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Danielle Welden. (Dillard, Timothy) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

#20

(#20) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 10/23/2023)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company. (Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

#18

(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ann Payne. (Dillard, Timothy) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company. (Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

#12

(#13) Evidentiary Material re #12 Motion to Remand to State Court by Ann Payne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Dillard, Timothy) Modified on 9/27/2023 (MEB2). (Entered: 09/27/2023)

10 #4

Exhibit

10 #3

Exhibit

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#6) ORDER - Before this Court is Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's (Doc. #4 ) and Defendant Cody Mordecai State Farm Agency's Motions to Dismiss (Doc. #3 ). Plaintiffs have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motions. Defendants will thereafter have eleven (11) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/13/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#6) ORDER - Before this Court is Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's (Doc. #4 ) and Defendant Cody Mordecai State Farm Agency's Motions to Dismiss (Doc. #3 ). Plaintiffs have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motions. Defendants will thereafter have eleven (11) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/13/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company (MEB2) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4424400. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Sumter County, Alabama, case number 60-cv-2023-900026, filed by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (MEB2). (Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/4/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2024. Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2024. Jury Trial is set for 9/3/2024 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/1/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Danielle Welden. (Dillard, Timothy) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 10/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company. (Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ann Payne. (Dillard, Timothy) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company. (Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) REPLY to re #10 in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company. (Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) REPLY to re #11 in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER - Before this Court is Plaintiffs' Ann Payne and Danielle Welden Motion to Remand (Doc. #12 ). Defendants have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motion. After the briefing period has expired, the Court will take Plaintiffs' motion under consideration without further notice to the parties. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/28/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Evidentiary Material re #12 Motion to Remand to State Court by Ann Payne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Dillard, Timothy) Modified on 9/27/2023 (MEB2). (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER - Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay of in the Alternative to Continue (Doc. #8 ). The Court DENIES this Motion. At this time, no Motion to Remand has been filed. The Court will rule on the Motion to Remand when and if it is filed and fully briefed. If the Court then decides to remand, any discovery that has occurred may be used in state court. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/22/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay by Danielle Welden. (Dillard, Timothy) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Russ on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Russ, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER - Before this Court is Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's (Doc. #4 ) and Defendant Cody Mordecai State Farm Agency's Motions to Dismiss (Doc. #3 ). Plaintiffs have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motions. Defendants will thereafter have eleven (11) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/13/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/12/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4424400. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Sumter County, Alabama, case number 60-cv-2023-900026, filed by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (MEB2). (Messina, Brooke) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company (MEB2) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Sumter County, Alabama, case number 60-cv-2023-900026, filed by Cody Mordecai State Farm Insurance Agency, State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (MEB2) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less