This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/24/2023 at 09:15:27 (UTC).

ONeal v. Albertson's, LLC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 ONeal filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Albertson's, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00643

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laron ONeal

Defendants

Albertson's, LLC. doing business as Albertson's

Safeway Inc. doing business as Albertson's

Albertson's Stores SUB LLC

AB Acquisition LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Farhan R. Naqvi

Sarah M Banda

Jacob A. Suty

Sarah M. Banda

Defendant Attorneys

Bailee Raquel Reese

Dallin Knecht

Jack P. Burden

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER Granting #13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/21/2023. Motions due by 1/22/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/24/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#14

(#14) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Laron ONeal.. (Suty, Jacob) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#13

(#13) First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Laron ONeal.. (Banda, Sarah) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Laron ONeal. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Suty, Jacob) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER. It Is Ordered that the order to show cause #5 is satisfied and this case will not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction at this time. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER Striking Certificate of Interested Parties. It is Ordered that plaintiff Laron Oneal's certificate of interested parties 9 is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). The certificate does not identify the citizenship of Laron Oneal as required by the recent amendment to that rule. It Is Further Ordered that plaintiff Laron Oneal to file a proper certificate of interested parties by May 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

8 #8

Exhibit G

8 #7

Exhibit F

8 #6

Exhibit E

8 #5

Exhibit D

8 #4

Exhibit C

8 #3

Exhibit B

8 #2

Exhibit A

8 #1

Index Index of Exhibits

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants AB Acquisition LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Albertson's, LLC., Safeway Inc... (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AB Acquisition LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Albertson's, LLC., Safeway Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Albertson's Companies, Inc. (DE; ID), Corporate Parent Albertson's Safeway LLC (DE; ID), Corporate Parent Albertson's Stores Sub LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Safeway Inc. (DE; CA), Other Affiliate Albertson's Holdings LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate AB Acquisition LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Albertson's Stores Sub Holdings LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Albertson's LLC {DE;ID), Other Affiliate ABS NV-O.LLC (DE; ID) for AB Acquisition LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Albertson's, LLC., Safeway Inc. added.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 5/5/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (LOE) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Granting #13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/21/2023. Motions due by 1/22/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/24/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Laron ONeal.. (Suty, Jacob) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Laron ONeal.. (Banda, Sarah) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Laron ONeal. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Suty, Jacob) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER. It Is Ordered that the order to show cause #5 is satisfied and this case will not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction at this time. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Striking Certificate of Interested Parties. It is Ordered that plaintiff Laron Oneal's certificate of interested parties 9 is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). The certificate does not identify the citizenship of Laron Oneal as required by the recent amendment to that rule. It Is Further Ordered that plaintiff Laron Oneal to file a proper certificate of interested parties by May 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause by Defendants AB Acquisition LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Albertson's, LLC., Safeway Inc... (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Burden, Jack) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants AB Acquisition LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Albertson's, LLC., Safeway Inc... (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AB Acquisition LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Albertson's, LLC., Safeway Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Albertson's Companies, Inc. (DE; ID), Corporate Parent Albertson's Safeway LLC (DE; ID), Corporate Parent Albertson's Stores Sub LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Safeway Inc. (DE; CA), Other Affiliate Albertson's Holdings LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate AB Acquisition LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Albertson's Stores Sub Holdings LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Albertson's LLC {DE;ID), Other Affiliate ABS NV-O.LLC (DE; ID) for AB Acquisition LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Albertson's, LLC., Safeway Inc. added.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 5/5/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Minutes of the Court dated April 25, 2023 by Albertson's, LLC. re #3 Minute Order Removal Case,.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/25/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/10/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/25/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-23-866641-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7278061) by Albertson's, LLC.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, #2 Index Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E) (Knecht, Dallin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less