This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2023 at 13:04:07 (UTC).

Flick Intelligence, LLC v. Google, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 Flick Intelligence, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Trina L Thompson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-04803

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Trina L Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flick Intelligence, LLC

Defendant

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William P. Ramey, III

Jeffrey Eugene Kubiak

Susan S.Q. Kalra

Defendant Attorneys

Bill Trac

Darin W Snyder

Mark Liang

Nathaniel Legum

Brian Christopher Banner

Darin Walter Snyder

Luann L. Simmons

 

Court Documents

#54

(#54) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings re #53 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patents. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/19/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2023) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

47 #1

Proposed Order

#47

(#57) ORDER VACATING MOTIONS #26 , #27 , AND #47 . In light of the cases transfer, the Court vacates pending motions #26 , #27 , and #47 . The parties may re-calendar these motions if needed based on the following briefing schedule: opening briefs for a motion to dismiss should be submitted by January 23, 2024 and if needed, a hearing will be scheduled for March 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/12/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

27 #3

Proposed Order

27 #2

Exhibit A

27 #1

Affidavit

#27

(#57) ORDER VACATING MOTIONS #26 , #27 , AND #47 . In light of the cases transfer, the Court vacates pending motions #26 , #27 , and #47 . The parties may re-calendar these motions if needed based on the following briefing schedule: opening briefs for a motion to dismiss should be submitted by January 23, 2024 and if needed, a hearing will be scheduled for March 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/12/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

26 #1

Proposed Order

#26

(#57) ORDER VACATING MOTIONS #26 , #27 , AND #47 . In light of the cases transfer, the Court vacates pending motions #26 , #27 , and #47 . The parties may re-calendar these motions if needed based on the following briefing schedule: opening briefs for a motion to dismiss should be submitted by January 23, 2024 and if needed, a hearing will be scheduled for March 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/12/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Flick Intelligence, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Flick Intelligence, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17015146), filed by Flick Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2023

Docket(#60) ORDER ON #59 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(i)(B). Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/13/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/13/2023) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

Docket(#59) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Flick Intelligence, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 10/13/2023) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

Docket(#58) NOTICE of Appearance by Susan S.Q. Kalra (Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 10/13/2023) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#57) ORDER VACATING MOTIONS #26 , #27 , AND #47 . In light of the cases transfer, the Court vacates pending motions #26 , #27 , and #47 . The parties may re-calendar these motions if needed based on the following briefing schedule: opening briefs for a motion to dismiss should be submitted by January 23, 2024 and if needed, a hearing will be scheduled for March 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/12/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

Docket(#56) CLERK'S NOTICE - RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference erroneously set for 1/4/2023 is re-set for 1/4/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Conference Statement due by 12/28/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 9/29/2023) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

Docket(#55) CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2023.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 9/19/2023) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#54) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings re #53 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patents. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/19/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2023) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#53) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Google LLC (Snyder, Darin) (Filed on 9/19/2023) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#52) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc. for Google LLC. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 3-15 (Snyder, Darin) (Filed on 9/19/2023) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#51) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2023) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Google, LLC. Attorney Brian Christopher Banner added to party Google, LLC(pty:dft) (Banner, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flick Intelligence, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flick Intelligence, LLC. Google, LLC served on 1/30/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Google, LLC. (ad3) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright due to related cases. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ad3) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by Flick Intelligence, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Flick Intelligence, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Flick Intelligence, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17015146), filed by Flick Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less