This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2023 at 08:09:59 (UTC).

Mullis v. Equifax Information Service, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2023 Mullis filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Service, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Anna M Manasco. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00718

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anna M Manasco

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Mullis

Defendants

Equifax Information Service, LLC

Experian Information Solutions Inc

Trans Union LLC

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John G Watts

M Stan Herring, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph D Steadman, Jr

L Jackson Young, Jr

Matthew Robinett

Virginia Rae Bradley

J Evans Bailey

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Michael Mullis. (Herring, M) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cellco Partnership. (Bailey, Dennis) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#14

(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Equifax Information Service, LLC. (Steadman, Joseph) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

11 #5

Text of Proposed Order

11 #4

Exhibit C

11 #3

Exhibit B

11 #2

Exhibit A

11 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Jenessa Graney

#11

(#11) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jenessa Graney, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bailey, J) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC. filed by Trans Union LLC (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Service, LLC. filed by Equifax Information Service, LLC (Steadman, Joseph) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#3

(#8) TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS #3 . Equifax Information Service, LLC answer due 7/8/2023. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/12/2023. (FNC) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Young, L) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Equifax Information Service, LLC. (Steadman, Joseph) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Michael Mullis. (Herring, M) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS #16 Attorney Dennis R Bailey terminated. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/21/2023. (FNC) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cellco Partnership. (Bailey, Dennis) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS #14 . Equifax Information Service, LLC answer due 8/7/2023. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/10/2023. (FNC) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Equifax Information Service, LLC. (Steadman, Joseph) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule on Defendant Cellco's Motion to Compel. Doc. #11 . Plaintiff's response is due within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. Defendant's reply is due within fourteen (14) days from the date Plaintiff's response is filed. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/6/2023. (FNC) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Cellco Partnership.(Bailey, J) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jenessa Graney, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bailey, J) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/5/2023. (FNC) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS #3 . Equifax Information Service, LLC answer due 7/8/2023. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/12/2023. (FNC) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Cellco Partnership.(Bailey, J) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC. filed by Trans Union LLC (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Service, LLC. filed by Equifax Information Service, LLC (Steadman, Joseph) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Equifax Information Service, LLC. (Steadman, Joseph) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Young, L) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4357633 (ALND receipt# B-5705). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cellco Partnership from Jeffeson County Circuit Court, case number 2023-1433., filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KAM). (Bailey, J) Modified on 6/7/2023 (AKD). (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketState Court Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL on 4/30/2023. (AKD) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cellco Partnership from Jeffeson County Circuit Court, case number 2023-1433., filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KAM) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less