This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2023 at 07:20:51 (UTC).

Payne v. County Of Harris et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2023 Payne filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County Of Harris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-03067

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Keith Payne

Defendants

County Of Harris

CITY OF HOUSTON

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

Troy Finner

Kim Ogg

Chief of Houston Police Department Troy Finner

Chief of District Attorney Office Kim Ogg

Detective Latrice Thorton

Sergeant Dunn

Officer Hinojosa

Officer Jarobe

Detective Adrian Healy

Detective Baker

ADA Harvey

Shanice Newton

David Mason

Amicus Curiae

Attorney General of Texas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jarvis Rice

Defendant Attorneys

Veronica Lynn Jones

Alexander Edward Garcia

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Christopher Lee Lindsey

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 11:10 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon, filed. (ShannonJones, 4) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) MOTION to Dismiss #13 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Chief of District Attorney Office Kim Ogg, County Of Harris, Harris County District Attorney Office, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Veronica) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of attorney substitution by Chief of District Attorney Office Kim Ogg, Harris County District Attorney Office. Attorney Veronica L. Jones added. Attorney Katherine Adele Teeters terminated, filed. (Jones, Veronica) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

15 #3

Exhibit

15 #2

Exhibit

15 #1

Exhibit

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss by ADA Harvey, Shanice Newton, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Teeters, Katherine) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

14 #4

Proposed Order

14 #3

Exhibit 3

14 #2

Exhibit 2

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss #13 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by City Of Houston, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Alexander) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

#13

(#13) First AMENDED PETITION with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Joseph Keith Payne.(Rice, Jarvis) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

#12

(#12) Opposed RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b), filed by Joseph Keith Payne. (Rice, Jarvis) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

7 #4

Proposed Order

7 #2

Exhibit 2

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b) by Chief of Houston Police Department Troy Finner, City Of Houston, Houston Police Department, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Alexander) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 11:10 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon, filed. (ShannonJones, 4) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss #13 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Chief of District Attorney Office Kim Ogg, County Of Harris, Harris County District Attorney Office, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Veronica) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) NOTICE of attorney substitution by Chief of District Attorney Office Kim Ogg, Harris County District Attorney Office. Attorney Veronica L. Jones added. Attorney Katherine Adele Teeters terminated, filed. (Jones, Veronica) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss by ADA Harvey, Shanice Newton, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Teeters, Katherine) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss #13 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by City Of Houston, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Alexander) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) First AMENDED PETITION with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Joseph Keith Payne.(Rice, Jarvis) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Opposed RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b), filed by Joseph Keith Payne. (Rice, Jarvis) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Amended RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Joseph Keith Payne. (Rice, Jarvis) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) REPLY to #8 Response to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Chief of District Attorney Office Kim Ogg, Harris County District Attorney Office, ADA Harvey, Shanice Newton, Kim Ogg. (Teeters, Katherine) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Opposed RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Joseph Keith Payne. (Rice, Jarvis) (Entered: 10/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Opposed RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Keith Payne. (Rice, Jarvis) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b) by Chief of Houston Police Department Troy Finner, City Of Houston, Houston Police Department, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Alexander) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by County Of Harris, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/3/2023. (Jones, Veronica) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ADVISORY by Attorney General of Texas, filed.(Lindsey, Christopher) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Chief of District Attorney Office Kim Ogg, Harris County District Attorney Office, ADA Harvey, Shanice Newton, Kim Ogg, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2023. (Teeters, Katherine) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jarvis Rice (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30417957) by Joseph Keith Payne, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2023. (Rice, Jarvis) (Entered: 08/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/27/2023 at 11:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JoanDavenport, 4) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County 125th Judicial District Court, case number 2023-38856 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30383915) filed by CITY OF HOUSTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Garcia, Alexander) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less