This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2023 at 08:15:40 (UTC).

Morgan v. Eckel Industries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 Morgan filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Eckel Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is F. Dennis Saylor, IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-10866

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

F. Dennis Saylor, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nancy Morgan

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

API Heat Transfer Inc.

Eckel Industries, Inc.

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

A.W. Chesterton Company

John Crane, Inc.

Harrison Radiator Division of General Motors Coporation

Process Engineering and Machine Co., Inc.

Yuba Heat Transfer LLC

Aurora Pump Co.

Electro Dynamic Corporation

Gardner Denver, Inc.

Goulds Pumps Incorporated

Grinnell LLC

Marotta Controls, Inc.

Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC

Nibco, Inc.

Parker-Hannifin Corporation

Quaker Chemical Corporation

Roth Pump Company

91 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ginger A. Gibbs

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

John P. Gardella

Michael F. McVinney

Kristen R. Souza

Margaret M. Lynch

Courtney Ann Richards

Craig R. Waksler

Clifford V. Pascarella

Julia Yasmin Simon

Wayne E. George

Catherine Mohan

Stesha A. Emmanuel

Susan A. Jackson

Other Attorneys

Robert G. Weller

Eric J. Robbie

John J. Robinson

Judith A. Perritano

Maria E. DeLuzio

Meghan L. Riordan

Anthony M. Moccia

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#121

(#121) SUMMONS Returned Executed Grundfos Water Utility Inc served on 6/13/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Wainwright, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#120

(#120) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Aurora Pump Co..(Waksler, Craig) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#119

(#119) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) by The Gorman-Rupp Company.(Robbie, Eric) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#118

(#118) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Gorman-Rupp Company. (Robbie, Eric) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#117

(#117) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Robbie on behalf of The Gorman-Rupp Company (Robbie, Eric) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#116

(#116) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Pump Co.. (Waksler, Craig) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#114

(#114) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Velan Valve Corporation. (Robinson, John) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#113

(#113) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Robinson, John) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#112

(#112) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Robinson, John) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yuba Heat Transfer LLC identifying Corporate Parent Connell Limited Partnership for Yuba Heat Transfer LLC.. (Souza, Kristen) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Yuba Heat Transfer LLC.(Souza, Kristen) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Yuba Heat Transfer LLC (Souza, Kristen) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Lynch on behalf of Yuba Heat Transfer LLC (Lynch, Margaret) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

1 #3

Category Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paramount Global f/k/a ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9819729 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Moccia, Anthony) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) SUMMONS Returned Executed Grundfos Water Utility Inc served on 6/13/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Wainwright, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Aurora Pump Co..(Waksler, Craig) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) by The Gorman-Rupp Company.(Robbie, Eric) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Gorman-Rupp Company. (Robbie, Eric) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Robbie on behalf of The Gorman-Rupp Company (Robbie, Eric) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Pump Co.. (Waksler, Craig) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Velan Valve Corporation. (Robinson, John) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Robinson, John) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Robinson, John) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford V. Pascarella on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Pascarella, Clifford) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Cetrulo, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yuba Heat Transfer LLC identifying Corporate Parent Connell Limited Partnership for Yuba Heat Transfer LLC.. (Souza, Kristen) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Yuba Heat Transfer LLC.(Souza, Kristen) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Yuba Heat Transfer LLC (Souza, Kristen) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Lynch on behalf of Yuba Heat Transfer LLC (Lynch, Margaret) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • Docket(#3) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Phillips, Sophie) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paramount Global f/k/a ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9819729 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Moccia, Anthony) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less