This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2023 at 06:44:43 (UTC).

Michael Yadegari et al v. Ford Motor Comany et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2023 Michael Yadegari filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Comany. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rozella A. Oliver and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-07438

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

Presiding Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Yadegari

Scott Goldwater

Defendants

Ford Motor Comany

Galpin Motors, Inc. a Californian Corporation doing business as Galpin Ford

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Bert Boeckmann

Eduardo Encinas

Daniel Sterkel

Carlos Guzman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donna Rebecca Dishbak

Michael Yadegari

Blake J Lindemann

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua D Cools

Samantha Marie Geraghty

Colin Patrick Cronin

Elizabeth V. McNulty

Kimberly M Kronk

Charles S Russell

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

#21

(#21) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-120) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, this case is transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-07438-KK-RAOx. (rn) (Entered: 11/21/2023)

#19

(#19) REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #16 Joint Reply filed by Defendant Ford Motor Comany. (McNulty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

#18

(#18) Objection Opposition to Defendants' Evidence re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #16 filed by Plaintiffs Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari. (Lindemann, Blake) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

17 #2

Exhibit 1

17 #1

Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #16 filed by Plaintiffs Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann, #2 Exhibit 1)(Lindemann, Blake) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

16 #5

Proposed Order

16 #4

Declaration of Charles Russell in support

16 #3

Declaration of Daniel Sterkel in support of

16 #2

Declaration of Elizabeth V. McNulty in support

16 #1

Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Ford Motor Comany. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth V. McNulty in support, #3 Declaration of Daniel Sterkel in support of, #4 Declaration of Charles Russell in support, #5 Proposed Order) (McNulty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Comany. (McNulty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

NON-CONFORMED COPY OF Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bert Boeckmann, Does, Eduardo Encinas, Ford Motor Comany, Galpin Motors, Inc., Carlos Guzman, Daniel Sterkel amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-120) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, this case is transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-07438-KK-RAOx. (rn) (Entered: 11/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the 11/20/2023 hearing on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action #16 (the "Motion") is VACATED and taken off-calendar. The hearing on the Motion will be re-set by the Court. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #16 Joint Reply filed by Defendant Ford Motor Comany. (McNulty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Objection Opposition to Defendants' Evidence re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #16 filed by Plaintiffs Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari. (Lindemann, Blake) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #16 filed by Plaintiffs Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann, #2 Exhibit 1)(Lindemann, Blake) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Ford Motor Comany. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth V. McNulty in support, #3 Declaration of Daniel Sterkel in support of, #4 Declaration of Charles Russell in support, #5 Proposed Order) (McNulty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS GALPIN MOTORS, INC., BERT BOECKMANN, EDUARDO ENCINAS, DANIEL STERKEL, CARLOS GUZMAN TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' OPERATIVE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for October 23, 2023, is CONTINUED to December 18, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. The parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report shall be filed no later than December 4, 2023. (iv) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bert Boeckmann answer now due 10/13/2023; Daniel Sterkel answer now due 10/13/2023; Carlos Guzman answer now due 10/13/2023; Galpin Motors, Inc. answer now due 10/13/2023; Eduardo Encinas answer now due 10/13/2023, re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Bert Boeckmann; Daniel Sterkel; Carlos Guzman; Galpin Motors, Inc.; Eduardo Encinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Proof of Service)(Russell, Charles) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (smom) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bert Boeckmann, Does, Eduardo Encinas, Ford Motor Comany, Galpin Motors, Inc., Carlos Guzman, Daniel Sterkel amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari, upon Defendant Eduardo Encinas served on 4/21/2023. in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari, upon Defendant Daniel Sterkel served on 4/21/2023. in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNONCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari, upon Defendant Bert Boeckmann served on 4/21/2023. in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari, upon Defendant Carlos Guzman served on 4/21/2023. in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT E TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNONCONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bert Boeckmann, Does, Eduardo Encinas, Ford Motor Comany, Galpin Motors, Inc., Carlos Guzman, Daniel Sterkel amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bert Boeckmann, Does, Eduardo Encinas, Ford Motor Comany, Galpin Motors, Inc., Carlos Guzman, Daniel Sterkel., filed by Plaintiffs Scott Goldwater, Michael Yadegari.[ FILED IN STATE COURT 10/12/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Comany. (McNulty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22VECV01578 Receipt No: ACACDC-35998846 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Comany. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Elizabeth V. McNulty added to party Ford Motor Comany(pty:dft))(McNulty, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less