This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2023 at 10:30:21 (UTC).

Bocci v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2023 Bocci filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01780

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Candace Bocci

Defendants

Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brian Peter Scibetta

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company,served on 4/19/2023, answer due 5/10/2023. Service was accepted by CT Corp. System - Kartik Pandya. Document filed by Candace Bocci. (sc) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#15

(#15) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. ENDORSEMENT Plaintiff's Amended Complaint having been filed, see Dkt. 14, Defendants shall oppose her motion for a preliminary injunction by May 1, 2023. Plaintiff may reply by May 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 5/15/2023., Responses due by 5/1/2023) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/17/2023) (jca) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

14 #3

Exhibit 4

14 #2

Exhibit 3

14 #1

Errata Main Document

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter, filed by Candace Bocci. ENDORSEMENT In order to make changes to the operative Complaint, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint. Plaintiff may seek assistance from the pro se intake office as to how to file an amended complaint. Once the Amended Complaint has been filed, the Court will set a deadline for Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/10/2023) (jca) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#12

(#12) LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Brian P. Scibetta, Esq. dated 04/07/2023 re: Plaintiff's April 4, 2023 letter request. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC..(Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

9 #9

Main Document

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company,served on 4/19/2023, answer due 5/10/2023. Service was accepted by CT Corp. System - Kartik Pandya. Document filed by Candace Bocci. (sc) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. ENDORSEMENT Plaintiff's Amended Complaint having been filed, see Dkt. 14, Defendants shall oppose her motion for a preliminary injunction by May 1, 2023. Plaintiff may reply by May 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 5/15/2023., Responses due by 5/1/2023) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/17/2023) (jca) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketSUMMONS REISSUED as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (kh) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT, Re: amending #1 Complaint, against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Candace Bocci. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(sc) (Main Document 14 replaced on 4/24/2023) (ta). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/24/2023) (ta). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2023: #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4) (ta). (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter, filed by Candace Bocci. ENDORSEMENT In order to make changes to the operative Complaint, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint. Plaintiff may seek assistance from the pro se intake office as to how to file an amended complaint. Once the Amended Complaint has been filed, the Court will set a deadline for Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/10/2023) (jca) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Brian P. Scibetta, Esq. dated 04/07/2023 re: Plaintiff's April 4, 2023 letter request. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC..(Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Peter Scibetta on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC..(Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, served on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. Service was accepted by Sarah Schoenbach, Vice Pres. and General Counsel. Document filed by Candace Bocci. (sc) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from C. Bocci, dated 4/4/23 re: "LETTER MOTION - REQUEST ADD QUALIFYING INFORMATION FOR A DEFENDANT". Document filed by Candace Bocci.(sc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2023: #1 Exhibit 1) (sc). (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Nationstar Mortgage LLC served on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe," auth. rep. of Corp. Service Co. Document filed by Candace Bocci. (sc) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from C. Bocci,dated 3/30/23 re:I am in receipt of your Order dated 3/24/23, directing that defendants be served by 3/31/23 etc. I was informed this morning from the Pro Se Intake Center that the timeline to serve the defendants is being accelerated due to my request for a preliminary injunction. I understand this, and I am requesting a two-week extension to 4/15/23 to serve the defendants. Document filed by Candace Bocci.(sc) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendants according to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by March 31, 2023, and to file proof of service on the docket by April 5, 2023. ( Service due by 3/31/2023.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/24/2023) (ate) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION, Re: Request for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Candace Bocci.(sc) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023

DocketPro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 credit card processed by the Finance Department on 03/03/2023, Receipt Number 13306. (sw) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (dsh) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (dsh) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Document filed by Candace Bocci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14) (sac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2023: #15 Exhibit) (rdz). (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less