This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2023 at 08:44:46 (UTC).

Golden Corral Corporation v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2023 Golden Corral Corporation filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Agri Stats, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and John F. Docherty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-01833

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

John F. Docherty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Golden Corral Corporation

Defendants

Agri Stats, Inc.

Clemens Food Group, LLC

The Clemens Family Corporation

JBS USA Food Company

Triumph Foods, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Mitchel

Blake Shepard, Jr

Ilana Arnowitz Drescher

Lori P. Lustrin

Robert W Turken

Scott N Wagner

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Golden Corral Corporations Notice of Joinder in Direct Action Plaintiffs Consolidated Complaint against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10355810) filed by Golden Corral Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shepard, Blake) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is a parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries reported for Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (MMP). (Entered: 06/16/2023)

#3

(#3) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lori Lustrin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10359769 filed by Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/12/2021.(CLK) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#6

(#6) PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/4/2022.(CLK) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#8

(#8) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ilana A. Drescher. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10361163 filed by Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#9

(#9) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERRO. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin Mitchel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10361173 filed by Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#10

(#10) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert W. Turken. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10361177 filed by Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#11

(#11) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott N. Wagner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10361189 filed by Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/21/2023)

 

Docket Entries

06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott N. Wagner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10361189 filed by Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert W. Turken. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10361177 filed by Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERRO. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin Mitchel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10361173 filed by Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ilana A. Drescher. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10361163 filed by Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

Docket(#7) Text Only NOTICE TO COUNSEL TO COMPLY WITH MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/12/2021. All papers shall be filed in civil case number 18-cv-1776 (JRT/JFD) and no further papers shall be filed in the individual case docket. (CLK) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/4/2022.(CLK) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/12/2021.(CLK) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

Docket(#4) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 23-cv-1833 JRT/JFD.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lori Lustrin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10359769 filed by Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is a parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries reported for Golden Corral Corporation. (Shepard, Blake) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (MMP). (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Golden Corral Corporations Notice of Joinder in Direct Action Plaintiffs Consolidated Complaint against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10355810) filed by Golden Corral Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shepard, Blake) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less