This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2023 at 08:02:09 (UTC).

Garcia v. National Liability and Fire Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/10/2023 Garcia filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Liability and Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-01731

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Garcia

Defendant

National Liability and Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Michael Snider

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Wayne Childs

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER. Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Remand (Document No. #4 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted as to the motion for remand and denied as to the request for attorney's fees and costs. This case is therefore REMANDED to the 215th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#8

(#8) Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Brenda Garcia, filed.(Snider, Ryan) (Entered: 07/03/2023)

#7

(#7) MOTION by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2023. (Childs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

6 #7

Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Remand

6 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F

6 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

6 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

6 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Remand)(Childs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

5 #2

Supplement Supplemental Notice of Removal

5 #1

Proposed Order Order on Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Notice of Removal

#5

(#5) First MOTION by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Notice of Removal, #2 Supplement Supplemental Notice of Removal)(Childs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

4 #2

Proposed Order Order

4 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit A

#4

(#4) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Brenda Garcia, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Snider, Ryan) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, filed.(Childs, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER. Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Remand (Document No. #4 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted as to the motion for remand and denied as to the request for attorney's fees and costs. This case is therefore REMANDED to the 215th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Brenda Garcia, filed.(Snider, Ryan) (Entered: 07/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2023. (Childs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Remand)(Childs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Notice of Removal, #2 Supplement Supplemental Notice of Removal)(Childs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Brenda Garcia, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Snider, Ryan) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, filed.(Childs, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/13/2023 at 10:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 215th District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2022-36389 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29894906) filed by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Childs, Matthew) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less