This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2023 at 07:37:08 (UTC).

Bello v. The American Bottling Co., et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2023 Bello filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The American Bottling Co ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah Barnes and Kimberly J. Mueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00655

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Bello

Defendants

The American Bottling Company

Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.

Taylor Marcus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey D. Klein

David Daniel Bibiyan

Jeffrey Charles Bils

Joshua Shirian

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel C. Whang

Laura E. Heyne

Heather E. Horn

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joshua Shirian on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Shirian, Joshua added. (Shirian, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

10 #3

VDRP

10 #2

Consent Form

10 #1

Standing Order

#10

(#10) AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Perdue, C.) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey D. Klein on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Klein, Jeffrey D. added. (Klein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Heather E. Horn on behalf of Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company. Attorney Horn, Heather E. added. (Horn, Heather) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Laura E. Heyne on behalf of Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company. Attorney Heyne, Laura E. added. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company re #3 Notice of Interested Parties, #1 Notice of Removal,. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

2 #2

VDRP

1 #5

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #4

Declaration of Taylor Marcus

1 #3

Declaration of Laura Heyne

1 #2

Declaration of John Tynan

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Supeior Court, County of San Joaquin, case number STK-CV-UOE-2022-7696 by Francisco Bello. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10794733) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Declaration of John Tynan, #3 Declaration of Laura Heyne, #4 Declaration of Taylor Marcus, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joshua Shirian on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Shirian, Joshua added. (Shirian, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Perdue, C.) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-0655 KJM DB. (Perdue, C.) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey D. Klein on behalf of Francisco Bello. Attorney Klein, Jeffrey D. added. (Klein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Heather E. Horn on behalf of Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company. Attorney Horn, Heather E. added. (Horn, Heather) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Laura E. Heyne on behalf of Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company. Attorney Heyne, Laura E. added. (Heyne, Laura) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company re #3 Notice of Interested Parties, #1 Notice of Removal,. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., Taylor Marcus, The American Bottling Company. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Donati, J) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Supeior Court, County of San Joaquin, case number STK-CV-UOE-2022-7696 by Francisco Bello. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10794733) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Declaration of John Tynan, #3 Declaration of Laura Heyne, #4 Declaration of Taylor Marcus, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less