This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2023 at 07:27:51 (UTC).

Robert Jacks v. American Credit Acceptance, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 Robert Jacks filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against American Credit Acceptance, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-00932

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Jacks

Defendants

American Credit Acceptance, LLC

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,

TransUnion, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garrett Forrester Charity

Defendant Attorneys

Alan D Leeth

Hillary J Green

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,, identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Service LLC. (Green, Hillary) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

17 #1

Summons Returned Executed

#17

(#17) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Jacks, upon Defendant American Credit Acceptance, LLC served on 6/14/2023, answer due 8/4/2023; Experian Information Solutions, Inc., served on 6/14/2023, answer due 8/4/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed)(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Credit Acceptance, LLC, (Leeth, Alan) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Credit Acceptance, LLC answer now due 8/4/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Credit Acceptance, LLC.(Attorney Alan D Leeth added to party American Credit Acceptance, LLC(pty:dft))(Leeth, Alan) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., answer now due 8/4/2023, filed by defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,.(Attorney Hillary J Green added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,(pty:dft))(Green, Hillary) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

#13

(#13) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

12 #1

Executed Waiver of Service

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Robert Jacks. upon Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/8/2023, answer due 8/7/2023; TransUnion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/8/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service)(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant American Credit Acceptance, LLC. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35386143 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Garrett Forrester Charity added to party Robert Jacks (pty:pla))(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,, identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Service LLC. (Green, Hillary) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Jacks, upon Defendant American Credit Acceptance, LLC served on 6/14/2023, answer due 8/4/2023; Experian Information Solutions, Inc., served on 6/14/2023, answer due 8/4/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed)(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Credit Acceptance, LLC, (Leeth, Alan) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Credit Acceptance, LLC answer now due 8/4/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Credit Acceptance, LLC.(Attorney Alan D Leeth added to party American Credit Acceptance, LLC(pty:dft))(Leeth, Alan) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., answer now due 8/4/2023, filed by defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,.(Attorney Hillary J Green added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,(pty:dft))(Green, Hillary) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Robert Jacks. upon Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/8/2023, answer due 8/7/2023; TransUnion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/8/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service)(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant American Credit Acceptance, LLC. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Robert Jacks. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robert Jacks. (Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35386143 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Garrett Forrester Charity added to party Robert Jacks (pty:pla))(Charity, Garrett) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less