This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/23/2023 at 07:39:42 (UTC).

Rivera v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 Rivera filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher P. Tuite and Steven D. Merryday. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-01148

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diomaries Rivera

Defendant

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Luis A. Cabassa

Sawyer Frescoln

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (CTR) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Luis A. Cabassa on behalf of Diomaries Rivera. Lead Counsel: Luis A. Cabassa. (Cabassa, Luis) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#7

(#7) WAIVER of service returned executed on May 30, 2023 by Diomaries Rivera as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Cabassa, Luis) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Diomaries Rivera. Related case(s): No (Cabassa, Luis) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Diomaries Rivera. (Cabassa, Luis) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Diomaries Rivera. (Cabassa, Luis) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Diomaries Rivera. Related case(s): No (Cabassa, Luis) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER of service returned executed on May 30, 2023 by Diomaries Rivera as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Cabassa, Luis) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Luis A. Cabassa on behalf of Diomaries Rivera. Lead Counsel: Luis A. Cabassa. (Cabassa, Luis) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL Luis A. Cabassa of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (CTR) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:23-cv-1148-SDM-CPT. (Gonzalez, Janet) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20869381) filed by Diomaries Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cabassa, Luis) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less