This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2023 at 10:04:17 (UTC).

Anicama v. Oracle America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 Anicama filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Oracle America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-04640

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mario Anicama

Defendants

Oracle America, Inc.

Michelle Myer

Don Watson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

David Benjamin Witkin

Christopher S. Alvarez

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/31/2023. The Court hereby VACATES the Motion to Dismiss Hearing on 12/21/2023. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/24/2023. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

#18

(#18) Statement of Non-Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss, re 17 Clerk's Notice filed by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson. (Related document(s) 17 , #10 ) (Alvarez, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2023) Modified on 10/11/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2023)

#15

(#15) Renotice motion hearing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed byMichelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/21/2023) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson re #13 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #11 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #12 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment, (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/21/2023) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#13

(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

10 #3

Proposed Order

10 #2

Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

10 #1

Declaration Of David B. Witkin In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Responses due by 10/2/2023. Replies due by 10/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of David B. Witkin In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order)(Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/18/2023) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

#3

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

#2

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Declaration Of Don Watson

1 #3

Declaration Of Michelle Myer

1 #2

Declaration Of Leslie Berge

1 #1

Declaration Of David B. Witkin

#1

#Electronic filing error. Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our most current version (10/2020) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Oracle America, Inc., Michelle Myer, Don Watson (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/31/2023. The Court hereby VACATES the Motion to Dismiss Hearing on 12/21/2023. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/24/2023. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Statement of Non-Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss, re 17 Clerk's Notice filed by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson. (Related document(s) 17 , #10 ) (Alvarez, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2023) Modified on 10/11/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOITON HEARING. Motion Hearing as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss reset from 11/16/2023 to 12/21/2023, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIERD TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 1:20 PMWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

Docket(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE. You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Edward M. Chen upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chen's Standing Orders and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2024, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRD TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 1:20 PM.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Renotice motion hearing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed byMichelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/21/2023) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson re #13 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #11 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #12 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment, (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/21/2023) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson.. (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/21/2023) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2023 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Responses due by 10/2/2023. Replies due by 10/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of David B. Witkin In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order)(Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/18/2023) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson re #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,,, (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson re 6 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Civil Cover Sheet by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson . (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our most current version (10/2020) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Oracle America, Inc., Michelle Myer, Don Watson (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson identifying Corporate Parent Oracle Corporation for Oracle America, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc., Don Watson re #1 Notice of Removal, (Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CIV03523. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18630274). Filed byDon Watson, Michelle Myer, Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of David B. Witkin, #2 Declaration Of Leslie Berge, #3 Declaration Of Michelle Myer, #4 Declaration Of Don Watson, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Witkin, David) (Filed on 9/11/2023) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less