This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/06/2023 at 07:52:35 (UTC).

Brabus GmbH v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 09/07/2023 Brabus GmbH filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-07441

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brabus GmbH

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

1superspeedparts668

allgoodstar

allgtmt

auto-factory

bestdeal_uk

bestdeals_eu

bestfancyhome

gxf-auto

haly_auto

happysunlight_2018

holara_online_store

huangyeallw

jiuranstore

luyauto

nxxydsm

ouleks

outstanding12

panxujiang

190 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

Michael A. Hierl

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 178, 205 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

#37

(#37) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/24/2023:Mailed notice(rj, ) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #32 . The Law Firm of Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the Court's website located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. The Court strikes the status date set for 10/26/2023 and resets it to 11/28/2023 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiff should file any motion for default and for entry of default judgment and notice it for presentment at the next status date. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. No appearance is required on 10/26/2023. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #32 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/26/2023 at 01:45 PM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

#34

(#34) DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #32 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

#33

No Description Available

#32

(#34) DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #32 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#27

RESTRICTED

#25

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

RESTRICTED

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 178, 205 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: Juanzi Shopping City, JUMOCEA, JUNMALL, Jzz Cozma, Lancedy, leilei mall, limuqibaihuo, liuyingchaos, long mall, LOPO MALL, LuWeiDongXiaoDian, LW762, NanChangAiTengRengShangMaoYouXianGongSi, OUXINXIAXIA, PARQUS Auto, qinhuangdaohanchunkejiyouxiangongsi, Qiuhua Mall, QJW118, qsonsell, Scoorbee, sdgfsdgrewtr-, shahezhensuoyibaihuoshangdian, shenyoubaihuo, SHIFENG Auto Parts, The Lower Dong, tong mall, TOSPY, USJIANPINGLKI, wakakafushi, WANGERXIAOWANGLUO, wangshufang, wangyubaihuo, wei.c89, wenbin mall, Wst258, Xcozdianpudu, xiangruidedianshangpu, xiaohuan shop, xutongwujin, YEYEP, yspwz, YUANPINGSHUYINGSHANGMAO, ZHUhuidianpuq, ZJIN, ZKSYZSM, ZONE SHINE, ZZG-DAM, ASHAMX1, ATTOE, Goojunnhh, Groceryarc, HAIKOUPENGTANKEJIYOUXIANGONGSI, hefeishiyuanzengwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, JIANNA, PingPing Shirt Shop, YANSHOP, YiXuanTradeCo.Ltd., Dengzhou Tuoxiang Trading Co., Ltd. and Dengzhou Tengchi Department Store added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 10/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: 65847Wall, 6840748Wall, 68768Mall, 6878Wall, 68988Mall, 6968Mall, 69898Mall, 70987 Mall, 74868Wall, 76654Mall, 776689, 7777655Mall, 875785Mall, 8785Mall, 887766, 90909Wall, 9899 money, A Xin Shopping Center, ADUCI, Aihua Shopping Mall, Autobro, BainvShopping, Chaijianhong, CHENGNIN, DanPing19, DD Mall, dengzhoushijiuqishangmaoyouxiangongsi, dengzhoushiliuyanshangmaoyouxiangongsi, dengzhoushiyingtushangmaoyouxiangongsi, DENGZHOUSHIYUNYISHANGMAOYOUXIANGONGSI, Direta, Dreamseek, DSFLH, EUXEMAO Auto Supply Store, fengzhiyuanmei666, FSTrend, fuyingblock, gjkhdfhkjhlllnlb, Guanhua Trading, hailingshangmaoyouxiangongsi, Haolahaola, henanouyameishiyeyouxiangongsi, HMM5522, HuiBenYou, HUYANRU, jiejie454673, jinanlindahongchengwangluokejifuwuyouxiangongsi and JINTANG XIAN HONGYI RIYONGPIN DIAN added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 10/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: phoneb, quality4print, rovce-auto, runnstar, sanceauto, shiwa5110, sifsaf_13, skybestico_us, splendiding, summer_6962, sunji-51, tastelich, theforce_car, tm-spower, veyem2, ypqk8591, Yuestore99, zhenlizha_0, 0098080, 09878943131, 123421, 23456776500, 38799Wall, 453452Mall, 4535789, 456655Wall, 4567890shopping centre, 465654Wall, 543454Mall, 567123shopping centre and 56790897675694 added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 10/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: 991_gt2, abc-motor, ace-cardesign, avdaertrade, behome99_uk, black_ants_auto, blingauto, c114271, car_shop1, car_studio239, car-turning, chifustore99-us, chleestore, coowei-auto, decent_auto, esuperior, g.sport.kit, gelikeshop8, globalsellerazz, goodcar-007, haikouxiuduishan0, hanggreater, hfj_auto_parts, hmtrust, hotsale8, huangshi_5479, iixk4843, ishop.it.now, jiangh_93, jongwoo_ko, kingofcartuning, lan19801021, leads_global, lilydetoy, luckyautocuiparts, mayer5585, meng-mao, nrzauto, nuoyoustore99_us and ok.shopping-8 added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 10/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: 1superspeedparts668, allgoodstar, allgtmt, auto-factory, bestdeal_uk, bestdeals_eu, bestfancyhome, gxf-auto, haly_auto, happysunlight_2018, holara_online_store, huangyeallw, jiuranstore, luyauto, nxxydsm, ouleks, outstanding12, panxujiang, partswell-suv, perfect_parts668, seg-3424, tan87-70, upwc168, yixi-2020-4-16, zhufan, chengduhenjingmindianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, Joint Venture Factory - Global Sales, Esst shop, Kezhong Tech and Muba shop added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 10/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/24/2023:Mailed notice(rj, ) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #32 . The Law Firm of Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the Court's website located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. The Court strikes the status date set for 10/26/2023 and resets it to 11/28/2023 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiff should file any motion for default and for entry of default judgment and notice it for presentment at the next status date. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. No appearance is required on 10/26/2023. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #32 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/26/2023 at 01:45 PM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #32 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
09/08/2023

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcm) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jcm) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Brabus GmbH (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Brabus GmbH Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Brabus GmbH to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brabus GmbH by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brabus GmbH by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brabus GmbH by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Brabus GmbH; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21016385. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less