This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2023 at 07:35:30 (UTC).

SLAUGHTER v. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 SLAUGHTER filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01406

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUSTIN MICHAEL SLAUGHTER

Defendant

NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C. Peter Sorenson

Defendant Attorney

Stephen DeGenaro

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

1 #20

Exhibit 116

1 #18

Exhibit 114

1 #15

Exhibit 111

1 #13

Exhibit 109

1 #10

Exhibit 106

1 #9

Exhibit 105

1 #8

Exhibit 104

1 #7

Exhibit 103

1 #6

Exhibit 102

1 #5

Exhibit 101

1 #3

Summons USAG

1 #2

Summons NOAA

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10076051) filed by DUSTIN MICHAEL SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons NOAA, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons USAU-DC, #5 Exhibit 101, #6 Exhibit 102, #7 Exhibit 103, #8 Exhibit 104, #9 Exhibit 105, #10 Exhibit 106, #11 Exhibit 107, #12 Exhibit 108, #13 Exhibit 109, #14 Exhibit 110, #15 Exhibit 111, #16 Exhibit 112, #17 Exhibit 113, #18 Exhibit 114, #19 Exhibit 115, #20 Exhibit 116)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTE ORDER: Defendant's #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's Response to the Complaint is due July 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/15/2023. (lcja) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zljn) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10076051) filed by DUSTIN MICHAEL SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons NOAA, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons USAU-DC, #5 Exhibit 101, #6 Exhibit 102, #7 Exhibit 103, #8 Exhibit 104, #9 Exhibit 105, #10 Exhibit 106, #11 Exhibit 107, #12 Exhibit 108, #13 Exhibit 109, #14 Exhibit 110, #15 Exhibit 111, #16 Exhibit 112, #17 Exhibit 113, #18 Exhibit 114, #19 Exhibit 115, #20 Exhibit 116)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less