This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2023 at 06:51:04 (UTC).

Rhoades v. AT&T Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Rhoades filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against AT T Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-61788

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sean Rhoades

Defendants

AT&T Corp.

Credence Resource Management, LLC

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

TransUnion, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel David Lucoff

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Joseph St. Angelo

Jason Daniel Joffe

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default. The Clerk shall set VACATE the Clerks Default [DE 24] against AT&T Corp and Credence Resource Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn) (Entered: 11/27/2023)

#29

(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sean Rhoades. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/27/2023)

#28

(#28) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by AT&T Corp.. (St. Angelo, Bradley) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

#27

(#27) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Credence Resource Management, LLC. (St. Angelo, Bradley) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Settlement by Sean Rhoades (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/21/2023)

#25

(#25) Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default by AT&T Corp., Credence Resource Management, LLC. (St. Angelo, Bradley) (Entered: 11/16/2023)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Credence Resource Management, LLC by Sean Rhoades. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/15/2023)

20 #1

Exhibit

#20

(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sean Rhoades. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/27/2023)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Summon(s)

1 #6

Summon(s)

1 #5

Summon(s)

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sean Rhoades. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/27/2023)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default. The Clerk shall set VACATE the Clerks Default [DE 24] against AT&T Corp and Credence Resource Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn) (Entered: 11/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his response by December 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/27/2023. (tcl) (Entered: 11/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sean Rhoades. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by AT&T Corp.. (St. Angelo, Bradley) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Credence Resource Management, LLC. (St. Angelo, Bradley) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) NOTICE of Settlement by Sean Rhoades (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default by AT&T Corp., Credence Resource Management, LLC. (St. Angelo, Bradley) (Entered: 11/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) (VACATED PER DE#31) Clerk's Entry of Default as to AT&T Corp., Credence Resource Management, LLC - Motions Terminated: #23 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, #22 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/15/2023. (cds) Modified text on 11/27/2023 (nwn). (Entered: 11/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to AT&T Corp. by Sean Rhoades. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Credence Resource Management, LLC by Sean Rhoades. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC (Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Jason Daniel Joffe added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sean Rhoades. Credence Resource Management, LLC served on 9/21/2023, response/answer due 10/12/2023. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sean Rhoades. TransUnion, LLC served on 9/21/2023, response/answer due 10/12/2023. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sean Rhoades. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/21/2023, response/answer due 10/12/2023. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sean Rhoades. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/22/2023, response/answer due 10/13/2023. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sean Rhoades. AT&T Corp. served on 9/22/2023, response/answer due 10/13/2023. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to AT&T Corp., Credence Resource Management, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC. (nwn) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16921683, filed by Sean Rhoades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less