This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2023 at 08:24:29 (UTC).

Saleh v. Burlington Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/29/2023 Saleh filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Burlington Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg Gerard Guidry and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-04852

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mustafa Saleh

Defendant

Burlington Insurance Company

Interested Party

Hurricane Ida Program Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Richard Ladd

Chinwe Onyenekwu

Harry E. Cantrell, Jr.

Interested Party Attorney

Francis Joseph Lobrano

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Burlington Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10118423) filed by Mustafa Saleh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Mark Richard Ladd added to party Mustafa Saleh(pty:pla).(Ladd, Mark) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/8/2023) (go). Modified attachment on 9/8/2023 (go). (Entered: 08/29/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Burlington Insurance Company. (go) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#5

(#5) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(go) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#6

(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#7

(#7) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

#8

(#8) Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(go) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Burlington Insurance Company. (go) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, Filing attorney did not properly format PDF of the summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (go) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (kls) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Burlington Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10118423) filed by Mustafa Saleh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Mark Richard Ladd added to party Mustafa Saleh(pty:pla).(Ladd, Mark) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/8/2023) (go). Modified attachment on 9/8/2023 (go). (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less