This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2023 at 07:39:29 (UTC).

Loyd v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 Loyd filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Publix Super Markets, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve C. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Loyd

Defendant

Publix Super Markets, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Regan E. Keebaugh

Jake Knanishu

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Menello

Asher Wise Lipsett

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Initial Disclosures by Susan Loyd.(Keebaugh, Regan) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Susan Loyd filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 26.3 Certificate of Service by Publix Super Markets, Inc..(Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#9

(#9) COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER approving the #6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery in this matter will conclude on October 2, 2023. Any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before November 1, 2023. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposedconsolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Courts ruling thereon. If neither motion(s) for summary judgment nor the proposed pretrial order are timely filed, the Clerk is directed to submit this matter for the Court for consideration. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 05/30/2023. (rsg) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

7 #2

Exhibit Attachment C Defendant's Document List

7 #1

Exhibit Attachment A Defendant's Witness List

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jake Knanishu on behalf of Susan Loyd (Knanishu, Jake) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:23-cv-00081-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/08/2023. (rsg) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with Jury Demand, filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/2/2023. (Filed in Superior Court of Barrow County on 03/20/2023.) (ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/05/2023)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Initial Disclosures by Susan Loyd.(Keebaugh, Regan) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Susan Loyd filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 26.3 Certificate of Service by Publix Super Markets, Inc..(Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER approving the #6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery in this matter will conclude on October 2, 2023. Any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before November 1, 2023. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposedconsolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Courts ruling thereon. If neither motion(s) for summary judgment nor the proposed pretrial order are timely filed, the Clerk is directed to submit this matter for the Court for consideration. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 05/30/2023. (rsg) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Disclosures by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A Defendant's Witness List, #2 Exhibit Attachment C Defendant's Document List)(Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jake Knanishu on behalf of Susan Loyd (Knanishu, Jake) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:23-cv-00081-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/08/2023. (rsg) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with Jury Demand, filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/2/2023. (Filed in Superior Court of Barrow County on 03/20/2023.) (ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12580005) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less