This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2023 at 08:13:46 (UTC).

Brown v. Covarrubias

Case Summary

On 06/09/2023 Brown filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Covarrubias. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-02164

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reginald Brown

Defendants

A. Covarrubias

Houston Police Department

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against A. Covarrubias (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Reginald Brown.(RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#2

(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Reginald Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/30/2023. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#4

(#4) CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Reginald Brown. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 7/13/2023, filed. (BeverlyGoolsby, 4) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#6

(#6) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Reginald Brown, filed. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#7

(#7) Letter from Reginald Brown re: Trust Account Statement, filed. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#5

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Reginald Brown. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Reginald Brown. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

#9

(#9) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Reginald Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/28/2023. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

#10

(#10) ***DOCKETED IN ERROR*** NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) Modified on 7/7/2023 (AaronJackson, 4). (Entered: 07/07/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(GabrielleLyons, 4) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Reginald Brown, filed.(GeorgeKelner, 4) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

 

Docket Entries

07/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Reginald Brown, filed.(GeorgeKelner, 4) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(GabrielleLyons, 4) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ***DOCKETED IN ERROR*** NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) Modified on 7/7/2023 (AaronJackson, 4). (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Reginald Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/28/2023. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Reginald Brown. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Reginald Brown. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Reginald Brown, filed. (BeverlyGoolsby, 4) (Entered: 07/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Letter from Reginald Brown re: Trust Account Statement, filed. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Reginald Brown, filed. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Reginald Brown. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 7/13/2023, filed. (BeverlyGoolsby, 4) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Reginald Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/30/2023. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against A. Covarrubias (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Reginald Brown.(RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less